Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:23-cv-01482
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Oct 26, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 5:29 AM PDT
Consol Plaintiff
Laura McNicholas
Represented By
David C OMara
The Omara Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Thomas McNicholas
Represented By
David C OMara
The Omara Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Caesars Entertainment Inc
Represented By
Adam Hosmer-Henner
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Garcia
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Kopelowitz Ostrow P.A.
contact info
Nathan R. Ring
Stranch, Jennings & Garvey PLLC
contact info
J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Stranch, Jennings & Garvey, Pplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, October 26, 2023
15 15 3 pgs order Order Consolidate Cases Mon 10/30 11:44 AM
ORDER to Consolidate Cases. ORDER Granting8 Motion to Consolidate Cases. It is ORDERED that 2:23-cv-01482, 2:23-cv-1483, 2:23-cv-01562, 3:23-cv-00470 is/are consolidated under 2:23-cv-01447-ART-BNW. It is ordered that the Leadership applications, pursuant to Rule 23(g)(3), shall be filed within 20 days of the date of this Order. It is ordered that the Defendant shall have 45 days from the filing of the superseding consolidated amended complaint to file a motion to dismiss or otherwise respond to that Complaint, Plaintiffs shall have 45 days thereafter to file their opposition, and Defendants shall have 30 days thereafter to file a reply in support. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
14 14 7 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/13 10:36 AM
ORDER Granting13 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/12/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
13 13 7 pgs motion Stipulation Wed 10/11 3:20 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Caesars Entertainment Inc. (Hosmer-Henner, Adam) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
12 12 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 10/11 11:06 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. J. Gerard Stranch, IV withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/10/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
11 11 8 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/11 9:23 AM
ORDER Granting9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Jeff Ostrow and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nathan R. Ring. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/10/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
10 10 motion Motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 10/06 5:02 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by J. Gerard Stranch, IV for Plaintiff Paul Garcia. Responses due by 10/20/2023.(Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 10/06 4:55 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeff Ostrow and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nathan Ring (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7452840) by Plaintiff Paul Garcia.(Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, Washington DC,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, Florida
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
8 8 notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Thu 10/05 12:12 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES TO SINGLE DISTRICT JUDGE AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court transfer and reassign Case No. 2:23-cv-01482-CDS-EJY, Case No. 2:23-cv-01483-APG-EJY, Case No. 2:23-cv-01562-APG-EJY, and Case No. 3:23-cv-00470-MMD-CSD to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01482-ART-BNW . Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum, District Judge Miranda M. Du, District Judge Andrew P. Gordon, District Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/4/2023. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/04 4:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Garcia re1 Complaint,,. Caesars Entertainment Inc served on 9/25/2023. (Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 10/03 3:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Paul Garcia. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Related Cases Tue 10/03 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:23-cv-01482; 2:23-cv-01483; 2:23-cv-01447; 2:23-cv-01562; 3:23-cv-00470 by Consol Plaintiffs Thomas McNicholas, Laura McNicholas. .(OMara, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
misc QC Notice Tue 10/03 9:31 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Paul Garcia. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/10/2023. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 09/22 1:09 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caesars Entertainment Inc. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 09/22 1:05 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Fri 09/22 1:06 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jeff Ostrow, J. Gerard Stranch IV to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/6/2023. (no image attached) (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 9:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Caesars Entertainment Inc (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7435462) by Paul Garcia. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/1/2023. Proof of service due by 12/20/2023. (Ring, Nathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Certificate of Interested Parties