Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:23-cv-01483
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Oct 26, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 5:30 AM PDT
Consol Plaintiff
Laura McNicholas
Represented By
David C OMara
The Omara Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Thomas McNicholas
Represented By
David C OMara
The Omara Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Caesars Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
Adam Hosmer-Henner
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexis Giuffre
Represented By
Nathan R. Ring
Stranch, Jennings & Garvey, PLLC
contact info
J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Stranch, Jennings & Garvey, Pplc
contact info
Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Kopelowitz Ostrow P.A.
contact info
Gary M. Klinger
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, October 26, 2023
25 25 3 pgs order Order Consolidate Cases ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/30 11:56 AM
ORDER to Consolidate Cases. ORDER Granting8 Motion to Consolidate Cases. It is ORDERED that 2:23-cv-01482, 2:23-cv-1483, 2:23-cv-01562, 3:23-cv-00470 is/are consolidated under 2:23-cv-01447-ART-BNW. It is ordered that the Leadership applications, pursuant to Rule 23(g)(3), shall be filed within 20 days of the date of this Order. It is ordered that the Defendant shall have 45 days from the filing of the superseding consolidated amended complaint to file a motion to dismiss or otherwise respond to that Complaint, Plaintiffs shall have 45 days thereafter to file their opposition, and Defendants shall have 30 days thereafter to file a reply in support. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
24 24 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Tue 10/17 7:47 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Set Aside ORDER AND MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION TO WITHDRAW GARY KLINGER AS ATTORNEY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court sets aside its Order Granting Mr. Klingers withdrawal 17 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Klinger shall continue to represent Plaintiff in this matter under the previously granted application for pro hac vice admission12 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/13/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
23 23 7 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/13 11:57 AM
ORDER granting20 Stipulation; answer to1 Complaint due 45 days after ruling on consolidation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 10/12 9:38 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alexis Giuffre. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Motion Set Aside Thu 10/12 7:11 AM
MOTION to Set Aside 17 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney And Motion To Strike Motion To Withdraw Gary Klinger As Attorney by Plaintiff Alexis Giuffre. (presiding) Responses due by 10/26/2023.(Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Mtn To Set Aside Order and Mtn To Strike Mtn To Withdraw
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
20 20 7 pgs motion Stipulation Wed 10/11 3:22 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Caesars Entertainment, Inc.. (Hosmer-Henner, Adam) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
19 19 7 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/11 9:44 AM
ORDER granting13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Jeff Ostrow for Alexis Giuffre and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Nathan R. Ring. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/10/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 10/10 3:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alexis Giuffre. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
17 17 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 10/10 11:55 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Gary M. Klinger withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/10/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
16 16 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 10/10 11:46 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney J. Gerard Stranch IV withdrawn from the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall continue to be represented by Jeff Ostrow, Gary M. Klinger and Nathan R. Ring as counsel of record in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/10/2023. Attorney J. Gerard Stranch IV terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
15 15 motion Motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 10/09 4:54 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gary Klinger for Plaintiff Alexis Giuffre. Responses due by 10/23/2023.(Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 06, 2023
14 14 motion Motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 10/06 5:12 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by J. Gerard Stranch, IV for Plaintiff Alexis Giuffre. Responses due by 10/20/2023.(Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 10/06 5:06 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeff Ostrow and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nathan Ring (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7452861) by Plaintiff Alexis Giuffre.(Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, Washington DC,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, Florida
12 12 7 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/06 12:01 PM
ORDER granting11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Gary M. Klinger for Alexis Giuffre and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Nathan R. Ring. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/6/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 10/06 6:06 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Klinger and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nathan R. Ring (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7451245) by Plaintiff Alexis Giuffre. (Klinger, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
10 10 notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Thu 10/05 12:59 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES TO SINGLE DISTRICT JUDGE AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court transfer and reassign Case No. 2:23-cv-01482-CDS-EJY, Case No. 2:23-cv-01483-APG-EJY, Case No. 2:23-cv-01562-APG-EJY, and Case No. 3:23-cv-00470-MMD-CSD to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01483-ART-BNW . Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum, District Judge Miranda M. Du, District Judge Andrew P. Gordon, District Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/4/2023. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/04 4:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexis Giuffre re1 Complaint,,. Caesars Entertainment, Inc. served on 9/25/2023. (Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Certificate Interested Parties Wed 10/04 11:11 AM
ORDER - Plaintiff Alexis Giuffre's certificate of interested parties (ECF No.7 ) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). A proper certificate of interested parties is due by October 20, 2023 . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 10/03 3:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alexis Giuffre. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice Related Cases Tue 10/03 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:23-cv-01483; 2:23-cv-01482; 2:23-cv-01447; 2:23-cv-01562; 3:23-cv-00470 by Consol Plaintiffs Thomas McNicholas, Laura McNicholas. .(OMara, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
misc QC Notice Tue 10/03 9:37 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Alexis Giuffre. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/10/2023. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
order Standing Order Mon 09/25 7:58 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 09/22 1:11 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caesars Entertainment, Inc. re1 Complaint. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Fri 09/22 12:01 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gary M. Klinger, J. Gerard Stranch IV, Jeff Ostrow to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/6/2023. (no image attached) (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 10:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Caesars Entertainment Corporation Inc (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7435472) by Alexis Giuffre. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/1/2023. Proof of service due by 12/20/2023. (Ring, Nathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Certificate of Interested Parties
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 09/22 12:00 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (AMMi)
Related: [-]