Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:23-cv-00462
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Nov 09, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
11 11 misc Mail Returned Wed 07/03 9:04 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re10 Order, addressed to Tyrone Noel Nunn via ESP Law Library. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/02 12:23 PM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that the motion for appointment of counsel and the motion for service of summons (ECF Nos.6 and7 ) are both DENIED. A certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 7/2/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/17 2:06 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable (RTS not at ESP) re ECF5 ,6 ,7 , and8 addressed to Tyrone Noel Nunn. (GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ECF 6,
Att: 2 ECF 7,
Att: 3 ECF 8
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 06/12 10:18 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tyrone Noel Nunn. (DLS)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 06/12 10:17 AM
MOTION for Service of Summons by Petitioner Tyrone Noel Nunn. Responses due by 6/26/2024. (DLS) (misc) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Motion Appointment of Counsel Wed 06/12 10:13 AM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Tyrone Noel Nunn. (DLS)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Petition Writ of Habeas Corpus Amended Wed 06/12 10:12 AM
AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Tyrone Noel Nunn. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
4 4 order Judgment Mon 11/13 9:08 AM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to ECF No.3 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 11/13 9:05 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE- It is therefore ordered that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court will send Petitioner Tyrone Noel Nunn the approved form for filing a 28 U.S.C. § 2254 petition and instructions for the same and the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same. (Attached hereto for distribution to P via ESP Law Library). It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 11/9/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Form 28 USC 2254 Petition,
Att: 2 IFP Form with Instructions
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Habeas only - FORM Thu 09/21 9:51 AM
NOTICE from USDC advising case against District of Nevada, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:23-cv-00462-ART-CSD . (GA)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Thu 09/21 9:47 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel