Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:23-cv-00463
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:May 08, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 09, 2024
10 10 misc Mail Returned Thu 05/09 11:32 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re8 Order,9 Judgment, addressed to Tyrone Noel Nunn via ESP Law Library. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ECF No. 9
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
9 9 order Judgment Wed 05/08 2:46 PM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to8 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 5/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 05/08 2:45 PM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff Nunn's failure to file a fully complete IFP application or pay the full $402.00 filing fee in compliance with this Court's October 12, 2023 and February 16, 2024 orders. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. No other documents may be filed in this now-closed case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
7 7 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Fri 02/16 12:43 PM
ORDER - it is ordered that Plaintiff's requests for appointment of counsel (ECF No.4 ,6 ) are denied without prejudice . It is further ordered that Plaintiff's incomplete application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No.5 ) is denied without prejudice . It is further ordered that Plaintiff's motion to consolidate cases (ECF No.6 ) is denied without prejudice . It is further ordered that, on or before March 18, 2024 , Plaintiff will either pay the full $402 filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis on this Court's approved form. It is further ordered that, on or before March 18, 2024 , Plaintiff will submit a single complete complaint, indicating the claims and defendants that Plaintiff is pursuing in this specific action to this Court. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court will send Plaintiff Tyrone Noel Nunn the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint and instructions for the same and the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same. (ATTACHED HERETO FOR DISTRIBUTION TO P VIA ESP LAW LIBRARY) . Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 2/16/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1983 Complaint form/Instructions,
Att: 2 IFP form/Instructions
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
6 6 motion Motion Consolidate Cases Tue 01/16 9:21 AM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases/ "Humble Composition Requisite requite ", by Plaintiff Tyrone Noel Nunn. Responses due by 1/30/2024. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
5 5 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/30 8:55 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Tyrone Noel Nunn. (GA)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Motion Appointment of Counsel Tue 11/28 2:54 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Tyrone Noel Nunn. (LG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
3 3 3 pgs order Order Fri 10/13 9:04 AM
ORDER - It is ordered that Plaintiff will submit a complaint to this Court on or before December 12, 2023 . It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court will send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint and instructions for the same. The Clerk of the Court will also send Plaintiff a copy of his "Ex Parte Motion for the Appointment of Counsel" (ECF No.1 -1). (ATTACHED HERETO FOR DISTRIBUTION TO P VIA ESP LAW LIBRARY) . It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court will send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by an inmate, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. (ATTACHED HERETO FOR DISTRIBUTION TO P VIA ESP LAW LIBRARY) It is further ordered that on or before December 12, 2023 , Plaintiff will either pay the full $402 filing fee or file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three required documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 10/12/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1983 Complaint Form/Instructions,
Att: 2 Inmate IFP Form/Instructions,
Att: 3 Ex Parte Motion
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Thu 09/21 10:48 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Thu 09/21 10:44 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel