Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Carla Baldwin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00464
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Dec 04, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
5 5 order Judgment Tue 12/05 11:02 AM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to ECF No.4 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/5/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
4 4 3 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 12/05 10:56 AM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full $402 filing fee and submit a complaint in compliance with this Court's September 25, 2023, order. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. No other documents may be filed in this now-closed case. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 12/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
3 3 3 pgs order Order Mon 09/25 10:36 AM
ORDER - Plaintiff will submit a complaint to this Court on or before November 21, 2023 . The Clerk of Court will send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint and instructions for the same. The Clerk of the Court will also send Plaintiff a copy of his motion for appointment of counsel and affidavit (ECF No.1 -1). The Clerk of the Court will send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by an inmate, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. (ATTACHED HERETO FOR DISTRIBUTION TO P VIA ESP LAW LIBRARY) . On or before November 21, 2023 , Plaintiff will either pay the full $402 filing fee or file a fully complete IFP application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/25/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint form/Instructions,
Att: 2 IFP form/Instructions,
Att: 3 ECF No. 1-1
Thursday, September 21, 2023
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Thu 09/21 11:30 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (GA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Thu 09/21 11:33 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
Related: [-]