Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30776

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:23-ap-03037
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kevleena Shenese Webb
6201 Barboursville Lane Apt 4D
North Chesterfield, VA 23234
Represented By
Kevleena Shenese Webb
contact info
Plaintiff
Afrikka Ennis
8218 Tatterton Trail
N. Chesterfield, VA 23237
Represented By
Afrikka Ennis
contact info
Plaintiff
LaVaniel Ennis
8218 Tatterton Trail
N. Chesterfield, VA 23237
Represented By
LaVaniel Ennis
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
23 23 court Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/13 1:08 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this document was mailed by first class mail postage prepaid to - Kevleena Webb, 1728 River Rock Drive, Chester, VA 23836 - herein as required by the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rules. Related [+] (Hall, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)21 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Sunday, December 24, 2023
22 22 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Mon 12/25 12:10 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)21 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, December 22, 2023
21 21 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 12/22 3:03 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (Hall, Linda)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
20 20 court Pre-Trial Conference Held Wed 12/06 3:12 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held; MOOT Related [+] Appearance: Jason Kane (JamesCummings)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis
19 19 court Hearing held Wed 12/06 3:11 PM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED; Defendant's oral motion for sanctions DENIED Related [+] Appearances: Afrikka Ennis, Jason Kane (JamesCummings)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/05 1:16 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by James E. Kane of Kane & Papa, PC on behalf of Kevleena Shenese Webb. (Kane, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/20 1:22 PM
Subpoena (Mar'leta D Jones) , Certificate of Service filed by Afrikka Ennis. (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/20 1:20 PM
Subpoena (Barbara Gaines Williams) , Certificate of Service filed by Afrikka Ennis. (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
15 15 court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Wed 11/08 4:33 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held and Continued; Related [+] Appearances: Afrikka Ennis, Kevleena Shenese Webb. Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/06/2023 at 12:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia, (MichelleStehle)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis
Saturday, November 04, 2023
14 14 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Hearing (Docketed by BNC) Sun 11/05 12:14 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 13 Request for Notice of Hearing
Thursday, November 02, 2023
13 13 court BNC Forms Request (VAN-022) Notice of Hearing Thu 11/02 9:16 AM
Request for Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/6/2023 at 12:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Hall, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Kevleena Shenese Webb
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
12 12 answer Response Wed 11/01 12:18 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis. (Cummings, James)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Kevleena Shenese Webb
Monday, October 23, 2023
11 11 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/23 5:51 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Kevleena Shenese Webb. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis
Friday, October 20, 2023
10 10 misc Exhibit Fri 10/20 12:19 PM
Exhibit Related [+] filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis. (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis
9 9 misc Certificate of Service of Subpoena Fri 10/20 12:17 PM
Certificate of Service of Subpoena Related [+] filed by Afrikka Ennis. (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Subpoena filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis
Friday, October 13, 2023
8 8 misc Subpoena Fri 10/13 11:27 AM
Subpoena to Appear and Testify at a Hearing or Trial to: Barbara Gains-Williams Related [+] filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis
Friday, October 06, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/10 9:21 AM
Certificate of Service (2) Related [+] filed by Afrikka Ennis. (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)4 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference - CerDocTyp
Monday, September 25, 2023
6 6 misc Request for Notice/Service Mon 09/25 12:35 PM
Request for Notice/Service filed by James E. Kane of Kane & Papa, PC on behalf of James E. Kane. (Kane, James)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 24, 2023
5 5 order Initial Scheduling Order Mon 09/25 12:14 AM
Initial Scheduling Order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
4 4 summon CerDocTyp - Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 09/25 12:14 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Friday, September 22, 2023
3 3 court Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee Fri 09/22 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 119547. Fee Amount $350.00. (ramirez-lowes)
Related: [-]
2 2 order|summon Initial Scheduling Order|Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 09/22 3:35 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to Kevleena Shenese Webb Answer Due 10/23/2023, Initial Scheduling Order Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/8/2023 at 12:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia, (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 09/22 10:33 AM
Adversary case 23-03037 Complaint against Kevleena Shenese Webb filed by Afrikka Ennis, LaVaniel Ennis. Nature of Suit: (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:20-bk-30776 (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-]