Nevada District Court
Judge:James C Mahan
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-01484
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 5:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Kody Gorden
9550 Trails Center Drive
Las Vegas, NV 89134
Defendant
Brittaney Robertson
1820 Sandstone Dr.
Las Vegas, NV 89161
Defendant
Wesley Robertson
1820 Sandstone Dr.
Las Vegas, NV 89161
Defendant
Michael Stiles
9714 Coffee Avenue
Las Vegas, NV 89147
Defendant
Fraser Inouye
Plaintiff
American National Property and Casualty Company
Pyatt Silvestri 701 Bridger Ave.
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Represented By
Ali R. Iqbal
Pyatt Silvestri
contact info
James P Silvestri
Pyatt Silvestri
contact info
Jose E. Carmona
Pyatt Silvestri
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
26 26 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 04/28 5:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Brittaney Robertson, Wesley Robertson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rasmussen, Lisa)
Related: [-]
25 25 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 04/28 5:26 PM
ANSWER to23 Amended Complaint filed by Brittaney Robertson, Wesley Robertson. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/8/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/12/2025.(Rasmussen, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
24 24 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/15 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff American National Property and Casualty Company. of Defendant Fraser Inouye with Prejudice (Iqbal, Ali)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Parties Wed 04/16 4:12 PM
Party Fraser Inouye terminated per24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (RJDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
23 23 cmp Complaint Amended Fri 03/21 1:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by American National Property and Casualty Company. Removes parties. (Iqbal, Ali)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/21 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff American National Property and Casualty Company. of Defendants Gorden and Stiles (Iqbal, Ali)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
21 21 misc Status Report Thu 03/13 11:58 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff American National Property and Casualty Company.(Silvestri, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
20 20 misc Notice 41-1 Dismissal Wed 02/19 3:50 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41-1. If no action is taken in this case within 30 days, the Court will enter an order of dismissal for want of prosecution. LR 41-1 dismissal deadline set for 3/21/2025. (HAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/08 1:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Property and Casualty Company. Kody Gorden served on 12/1/2023. (Silvestri, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/17 4:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Property and Casualty Company. Wesley Robertson served on 11/4/2023. (Silvestri, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/17 4:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Property and Casualty Company. Michael Stiles served on 10/31/2023. (Silvestri, James)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/17 4:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Property and Casualty Company. Fraser Inouye served on 11/3/2023. (Silvestri, James)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/17 4:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by American National Property and Casualty Company. Brittaney Robertson served on 11/4/2023. (Silvestri, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
14 14 service Summons Issued Wed 11/01 9:11 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fraser Inouye re1 Complaint. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
13 13 service Proposed Summons to be issued Tue 10/31 10:58 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Summons in Civil Action by Plaintiff American National Property and Casualty Company. (Silvestri, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
12 12 service Summons Issued Thu 10/12 3:35 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kody Gorden, Wesley Robertson, Michael Stiles re1 Complaint. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued - Michael Stiles,
Att: 2 Summons Issued Wesley Robertson
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
11 11 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 10/11 4:54 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American National Property and Casualty Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Iqbal, Ali)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 10/10 11:09 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kody Gorden, Brittaney Robertson, Wesley Robertson, Michael Stiles re1 Complaint. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
minord Minute Order Recusal Tue 10/10 11:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/10/2023. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NJK)
Related: [-]
notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Tue 10/10 4:46 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01484-JCM-EJY . (no image attached) (EDS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
7 7 service Proposed Summons to be issued Mon 10/09 3:35 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Summons in Civil Action by Plaintiff American National Property and Casualty Company. (Iqbal, Ali)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed Summons to be issued Mon 10/09 3:33 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Summons in Civil Action by Plaintiff American National Property and Casualty Company. (Iqbal, Ali)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed Summons to be issued Mon 10/09 3:31 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Summons in Civil Action by Plaintiff American National Property and Casualty Company. (Iqbal, Ali)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed Summons to be issued Mon 10/09 3:26 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Summons in Civil Action by Plaintiff American National Property and Casualty Company. (Iqbal, Ali)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/04 11:04 AM
ORDER. Plaintiff must file an amended certificate of interested parties by October 11, 2023, fully identifying the citizenship of every individual and entity attributed to it. Amended Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 10/03 10:06 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American National Property and Casualty Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Iqbal, Ali)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 11:00 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNVDC-7435862) by American National Property and Casualty Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/2/2023. Proof of service due by 12/21/2023. (Iqbal, Ali)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 09/22 2:18 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RGDG)
Related: [-]