New Jersey District Court
Judge:Evelyn Padin
Case #: 2:23-cv-20588
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Terminated:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:10 AM EDT
Defendant
US SECRETARY ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By
ANDREW BOCCIO
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
AMBASSADOR MARK BRZEZINSKI
Represented By
ANDREW BOCCIO
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
SECRETARY ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Represented By
ANDREW BOCCIO
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
U.S. EMBASSY IN WARSAW, POLAND
Represented By
ANDREW BOCCIO
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
KIRIL VLADIMIROVICH KAZAK
Represented By
IFEOMA ANTONIA ODUNLAMI
contact info
Plaintiff
ELINA ALEKSANDROVNA MUSHKINA
Represented By
IFEOMA ANTONIA ODUNLAMI
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 06/05 10:51 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Wed 06/05 10:48 AM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 4l(a)(l)(A)(i), without prejudice. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 6/4/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Mon 06/03 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KIRIL VLADIMIROVICH KAZAK, ELINA ALEKSANDROVNA MUSHKINA (ODUNLAMI, IFEOMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
14 14 order Order Fri 01/19 11:48 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court permits Defendants' Motion, D.E.9 , to proceed, and notes that parties should reference Judge Padin's General Pretrial and Trial Procedures, specifically Section II(E)(i), before future motion practice. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 1/19/2024. (bt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
13 13 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Tue 01/09 11:57 AM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (BOCCIO, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, January 08, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Mon 01/08 5:08 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs and Defendants re 10 Order,. (BOCCIO, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/02 11:41 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (ODUNLAMI, IFEOMA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C,
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Wed 12/27 12:54 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee received as to John Ting $ 150, receipt number TRE136263 (jal, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
10 10 order Order Fri 12/22 10:50 AM
TEXT ORDER: It is ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status letter by 01/08/2024, as the U.S. Department of State's website indicates that Plaintiffs' representations to the Court are not accurate. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 12/22/2023. (bt)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/22 2:36 PM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 1/16/2024 before Judge Evelyn Padin. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 12/19 2:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All Defendants. Responses due by 1/2/2024.(BOCCIO, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration of Samuel W. McDonald,
Att: 3 Exhibit - Unpublished Radhakrishnan Decision,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
8 8 3 pgs order Order Tue 12/05 3:41 PM
ORDER granting Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JOHN TING, ESQ.. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 12/5/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 12/05 4:29 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document6 submitted by ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, MARK BRZEZINSKI, U.S. EMBASSY IN WARSAW, POLAND, ANTONY BLINKEN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/19/2023. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Mon 12/04 7:17 PM
Letter from Ifeoma Odunlami, Esq.. (ODUNLAMI, IFEOMA)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 12/04 9:26 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants.. (BOCCIO, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/04 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW BOCCIO on behalf of ANTONY BLINKEN, MARK BRZEZINSKI, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. EMBASSY IN WARSAW, POLAND (BOCCIO, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/12 6:24 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs.(ODUNLAMI, IFEOMA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certificate of Good standing
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/12 4:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KIRIL VLADIMIROVICH KAZAK, ELINA ALEKSANDROVNA MUSHKINA. All Defendants.(ODUNLAMI, IFEOMA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons AG Summons,
Att: 2 Summons Blinken Summons,
Att: 3 Summons Brzezinski Summons,
Att: 4 Summons Embassy Summons,
Att: 5 Summons Mayorkas Summons
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/26 10:38 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANTONY BLINKEN, MARK BRZEZINSKI, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. EMBASSY IN WARSAW, POLAND. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14721753), filed by KIRIL VLADIMIROVICH KAZAK, ELINA ALEKSANDROVNA MUSHKINA.(ODUNLAMI, IFEOMA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/22 3:40 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Evelyn Padin. (ak, )
Related: [-]