North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 7:23-cv-01310
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:15 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Elizabeth Platt
Department Of Justice
contact info
Daniel Charles Eagles
Doj-Civ
contact info
Haroon Anwar
Doj-Civ
contact info
Patrick Ryan
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Allison Meredith O'Leary
Doj-Civ
contact info
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Rodger Michael
Represented By
James Z. Foster
Foster Law LLC
contact info
Forrest Fob James, IV
Fob James Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
17 17 minutes Status Conference Wed 01/24 4:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle in Raleigh: Hearing held on 1/24/2024. Counsel for both parties present. Court hears from parties regarding status of settlement and timeline for trials. (Court Reporter Jenny Carroll) (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response Wed 01/24 12:20 PM
RESPONSE regarding15 Response Plaintiffs' Leadership Group's Reply to United States' Response to Plaintiffs' Leadership Group's Rule 16 Statement filed by Rodger Michael. (Bell, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
15 15 misc Response (non motion) Tue 01/23 6:42 PM
RESPONSE by Defendant United States of America regarding13 Notice - other PLAINTIFF'S RULE 16 STATEMENT (Eagles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 6:40 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Charles Eagles on behalf of United States of America. (Eagles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
13 13 notice Notice-other Mon 01/22 5:01 PM
Notice filed by Rodger Michael RULE 16 STATEMENT . (Bell, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Special Appearance Mon 01/22 2:28 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Forrest Fob James, IV on behalf of Rodger Michael. (James, Forrest)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/19 9:02 AM
TEXT ORDER granting11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Forrest H. James, IV must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/19/2024. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Thu 01/18 3:33 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit of Forrest H. James, IV filed by Rodger Michael. (Foster, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Receipt
Monday, January 08, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Hearings Mon 01/08 5:55 PM
Order Setting Hearing - Hearing set for 1/24/2024 at 02:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. The Court will inquire as to the prospect of intermediate settlement in the above-captioned cases. Any counsel in attendance are encouraged to confer with their clients in advance of thehearing to explore the party's settlement position. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/5/2024. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/15 4:28 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Allison Meredith O'Leary on behalf of United States of America. (O'Leary, Allison)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/16 9:41 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Allison Meredith O'Leary on behalf of United States of America. (O'Leary, Allison)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/02 4:56 PM
SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Rodger Michael. (Foster, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/31 4:01 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Haroon Anwar on behalf of United States of America. (Anwar, Haroon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/26 1:42 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Platt on behalf of United States of America. (Platt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/12 3:08 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Ryan on behalf of United States of America. (Ryan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 09/22 2:26 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Michael Rodger (Foster, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 2:25 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by James Z. Foster on behalf of Michael Rodger. (Foster, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 2:20 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7279456.), filed by Michael Rodger. (Foster, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Fri 09/22 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]