North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Louise Wood Flanagan
Case #: 7:23-cv-01307
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:15 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Nathan Jisu Bu
Doj-Civ
contact info
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Gary Little
Represented By
James Z. Foster
Foster Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, November 03, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/03 10:38 AM
SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Gary Little. (Foster, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 30, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 09/30 11:05 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Nathan Jisu Bu on behalf of United States of America. (Bu, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 09/22 11:51 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Gary Little (Foster, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 11:49 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by James Z. Foster on behalf of Gary Little. (Foster, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7278953.), filed by Gary Little. (Foster, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Fri 09/22 12:09 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]