West Virginia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Kleeh
Case #: 1:23-cv-00077
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Terminated:Oct 30, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Charles Tennant
Represented By
Joy D. Llaguno
Hook & Hook
contact info
Matthew Miller
Hook & Hook PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marion County Coal Resources, Inc.
Represented By
J. R. Hall
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Rodger L. Puz
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/22/2023 4:40 PM EDT
Friday, September 22, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Tennant, filed by Marion County Coal Resources, Inc. Filing Fee - $402 Receipt #AWVNDC-3793158. (snc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Deed,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 -Well Survey,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Well Survey,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Maps,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Verification and Affidavit,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 *** PAPERLESS NOTICE -- Case filing began in CM/ECF shell case with filing fee being paid through pay.gov Related [+] on 09/21/2023. However, filer failed to complete filing process following receipt of payment. Clerk's Office notified filer of incomplete filing and the complaint was received on 09/22/2023 in the shell case. (snc)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWVNDC-3793158
4 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Marion County Coal Resources, Inc..(Hall, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 12 pgs Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Marion County Coal Resources, Inc.. (Hall, J.)
Related: [-]