Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Philip P Simon
Referred: Andrew P Rodovich
Case #: 2:23-cv-00317
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Terminated:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Gary Alumni Pathway to Students, Inc.
Represented By
Shelice R Tolbert
Tolbert & Tolbert LLC
contact info
Candace C Dickson
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp - Hi/in
contact info
Michael E Tolbert
Tolbert & Tolbert LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charity Peterson
Represented By
Sarah Guffey
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer Llc - Ind/in
contact info
Andrew Dutkanych, III
Biesecker Dutkanych & Macer Llc - Ind/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, November 22, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 11/22 10:15 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Stipulation of Dismissal19 is GRANTED. The Clerk is ORDERED to DISMISS this entire cause of action WITH PREJUDICE. Last, the Clerk is ORDERED to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/22/2024. (ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
19 19 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Thu 11/21 4:20 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss by Defendant Gary Alumni Pathway to Students, Inc.. (Tolbert, Shelice)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
18 18 notice Notice - Other Thu 09/12 5:30 PM
NOTICE: Due to the backlog of cases caused by prior judicial vacancies, there is likely to be delay in the disposition of this case by a District Judge either by trial or other proceeding. The parties now have a second opportunity to consent to the magistrate judge to conduct any and all proceedings in this case, including entry of final judgment, in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and Local Rule 72-1. All parties must agree to having the magistrate judge hear the case and file an Agreed Notice of Full Consent. Only one Agreed Notice of Full Consent should be filed for all parties in this case. Absent an agreement, the case will remain on the docket of the district judge and no party should report to the court or chambers the inability to reach an agreement.(ksc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 08/30 5:00 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Philip P Simon for all further proceedings. Judge Jon E DeGuilio no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 8/30/24. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Fri 02/02 3:10 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Withdraw15 . The appearance of Candace C. Dickson is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre P Rodovich on 2/2/2024. (rmf)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Withdraw Fri 02/02 12:23 PM
MOTION to Withdraw by Defendant Gary Alumni Pathway to Students, Inc.. (Tolbert, Shelice)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
14 14 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Fri 11/17 12:07 PM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/17/2023, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Sarah Guffey. Dft appeared by atty Shelice Tolbert. The Report filed as DE13 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 1/12/2024. Fact discovery to be completed by 10/23/2024. Expert discovery to be completed by 1/23/2025. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 12/20/2024. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 1/21/2025. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. (tc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Mon 11/13 4:36 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Tolbert, Shelice)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/10 4:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Gary Alumni Pathway to Students, Inc..(Tolbert, Shelice)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/03 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Guffey on behalf of Charity Peterson (Guffey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Fri 11/03 12:52 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 11/03 12:51 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2023 11:00 AM Central time before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Parties are instructed to dial 833-568-8864, enter Meeting ID 161 6723 3388 and passcode 649671 when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/3/2023. (tc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 order Order Thu 10/12 10:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/12/2023. (tc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 10/12 2:57 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer ddl reset to 11/10/2023 re5 . (tc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/11 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E Tolbert on behalf of Gary Alumni Pathway to Students, Inc. (Tolbert, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/11 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Candace C Williams on behalf of Gary Alumni Pathway to Students, Inc. (Williams, Candace)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/11 4:42 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Defendant Gary Alumni Pathway to Students, Inc.. (Tolbert, Shelice)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/11 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shelice R Tolbert on behalf of Gary Alumni Pathway to Students, Inc. (Tolbert, Shelice)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 09/25 7:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Gary Alumni Pathway to Students, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kmt)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 09/25 7:22 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of CHARITY PETERSON (Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against GARY ALUMNI PATHWAY TO STUDENTS, INC.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5362422.), filed by CHARITY PETERSON.(Dutkanych, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons