Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Case #: 2:23-cv-01485
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Terminated:Feb 23, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
17 17 notice Notice Other Wed 03/20 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Petitioner's Removal from the United States by Merrick Garland, Merrick Mayorkas, Kerri Ann Quihuis, The United States of America re15 Order,. (Pearson, Skyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
16 16 order Judgment Fri 02/23 4:10 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Eduardo Ernesto Ortiz-Castillo against The United States of America, Kerri Ann Quihuis, Merrick Garland, Merrick Mayorkas. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/23/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
15 15 8 pgs order Order Fri 02/23 4:04 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner Eduardo Ernesto Ortiz-Castillo's7 Petition for federal habeas corpus relief under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days of the date of this order, Respondents shall provide Ortiz-Castillo with an individualized bond hearing before an immigration judge. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/23/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
14 14 respm Reply Wed 02/21 12:37 PM
REPLY to12 Response7 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Eduardo Ernesto Ortiz-Castillo. (CAH) Modified on 2/21/2024 (HAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Mon 02/12 3:31 PM
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Petitioner Eduardo Ernesto Ortiz-Castillo file a reply to Respondents12 response within 14 days of the date of this order, unless additional time is allowed for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
12 12 respm Response Fri 02/02 11:12 AM
RESPONSE to7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondents Merrick Garland, Merrick Mayorkas, Kerri Ann Quihuis, The United States of America.(Pearson, Skyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
Monday, January 08, 2024
notice MDC - Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Mon 01/08 3:03 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01485-RFB-MDC . (no image attached) (LG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Thu 01/04 10:16 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents have up to and including February 2, 2024, to file their response. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/3/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
9 9 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Tue 01/02 4:53 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,6 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis,,,,,,, by Respondents Merrick Garland, Merrick Mayorkas, Kerri Ann Quihuis, The United States of America. Responses due by 1/16/2024. (Rose, Patrick) (answer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
8 8 misc Receipt Payment Wed 12/27 1:46 PM
RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5, receipt number 200007141. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
7 7 cmp Petition Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 12/13 3:36 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Eduardo Ernesto Ortiz-Castillo. (CAH)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/13 3:32 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for appointment of counsel 3-1 is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Clerk of Court (1) file the petition 1-1 and (2) serve the petition on Respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents must file and serve their response to the petition within 21 days of the date of this order, unless additional time is allowed for good cause shown. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to STRIKE the December 12, 2023, Order5 as entered in error. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF cc Copies of Petition to Parties via mail- CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
5 5 order Order Wed 12/13 2:09 PM
STRICKEN per 6 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the initial screening of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1-1 is deferred to until such time as Ortiz-Castillo has fully complied with this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 45 days of the date of this order, Ortiz Castillo must file an IFP application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Ortiz-Castillos failure to comply with this order within 45 days by (a) submitting a complete IFP application, or (b) paying the filing fee will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further advance notice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF cc Two copies of Order, IFP sent via mail - CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 10/12 9:12 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eduardo Ernesto Ortiz-Castillo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (CAH)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/12 9:09 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Eduardo Ernesto Ortiz-Castillo.(CAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 25, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Habeas only - FORM Mon 09/25 11:57 AM
NOTICE from USDC advising case against has been received and assigned case number 2:23-cv-01485-RFB-VCF . (CT)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Mon 09/25 10:49 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (CT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus