New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:23-cv-20602
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:12 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY
Represented By
THOMAS ROBERT BROPHY
The Port Authority Of New York & New Jersey
contact info
Cross Claimant
LOUIS P. KLOCK
Represented By
THOMAS ROBERT BROPHY
The Port Authority Of New York & New Jersey
contact info
Cross Defendant
UNITED AIRLINES INC.
Represented By
NICHOLAS EVAN PANTELOPOULOS
Kma Zuckert LLC
contact info
JENNIFER HUANG
Kma Zuckert LLC
contact info
Defendant
PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY
Represented By
THOMAS ROBERT BROPHY
The Port Authority Of New York & New Jersey
contact info
Defendant
UNITED GROUND EXPRESS INC.
Represented By
NICHOLAS EVAN PANTELOPOULOS
Kma Zuckert LLC
contact info
JENNIFER HUANG
Kma Zuckert LLC
contact info
Defendant
UNITED AIRLINES INC.
Represented By
NICHOLAS EVAN PANTELOPOULOS
Kma Zuckert LLC
contact info
JENNIFER HUANG
Kma Zuckert LLC
contact info
Defendant
PHILLIPE FRANCOIS RIVERA
Defendant
ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES 1-20 (as yet unidentified entities)
Defendant
HUNLEY LAWRENCE
Defendant
LOUIS P. KLOCK
Represented By
THOMAS ROBERT BROPHY
The Port Authority Of New York & New Jersey
contact info
Defendant
EMILIO W. GONZALEZ
Defendant
DOES 1-20 (as yet unidentified persons)
Defendant
EDWARD CETNAR
Defendant
E. BOQUIREN
Defendant
JOHN BILCH
Plaintiff
BRENDAN LANGLEY
Represented By
RICHARD KLAUBER
Weisberg & Klauber, LLC
contact info

GPO Jun 28 2024
OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 6/28/2024. (dam)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
57 57 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Thu 04/24 4:14 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/24/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
56 56 misc Proposed Order Wed 04/23 3:47 PM
Proposed Order Re: Amended Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order by UNITED AIRLINES INC., UNITED GROUND EXPRESS INC.. (HUANG, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]