North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Meyers
Referred: Robert B Jones, Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-00152
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:206 Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
31 31 order Judgment Wed 01/22 11:50 AM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED that Counsel for plaintiffs motion [DE-28] for approval of attorneys fees is ALLOWED in the full amount requested of $18,314.18. The Commissioner shall release to plaintiffs counsel the amount withheld from plaintiffs past-due benefits. Upon receipt of the § 406(b) fees, plaintiffs counsel shall refund to plaintiff the sum of $5,500.00 in attorneys fees representing the attorneys fees that counsel received pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/22/2025. (Horton, B.)
Related: [-]
30 30 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 01/22 11:41 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Counsel for plaintiffs motion [DE-28] for approval of attorneys fees is ALLOWED in the full amount requested of $18,314.18. The Commissioner shall release to plaintiffs counsel the amount withheld from plaintiffs past-due benefits. Upon receipt of the § 406(b) fees, plaintiffs counsel shall refund to plaintiff the sum of $5,500.00 in attorneys fees representing the attorneys fees that counsel received pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/19/2025. (Horton, B.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
29 29 respm Response to Motion Tue 12/03 7:34 AM
RESPONSE to Motion regarding28 MOTION for Attorney Fees under Section 406(b) of the Social Security Act filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Kernicky, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order awarding Fees under 42 USC 406(b)
Thursday, November 21, 2024
28 28 motion Attorney Fees Thu 11/21 3:13 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees under Section 406(b) of the Social Security Act filed by Jennifer Brown. (Arrowood, Derrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Award,
Att: 2 Time Log,
Att: 3 Fee Contract,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 27, 2024
27 27 order Judgment Thu 06/27 3:58 PM
JUDGMENT - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the consent motion by plaintiff [DE-23] is ALLOWED. The Commissioner shall pay $5,500.00 in attorneys fees associated with this case in full satisfaction of any and all claims arising under the EAJA. Provided that the award to plaintiff is not subject to the Treasury Offset Program (Program), payment shall be made by check payable to plaintiffs counsel, Derrick Arrowood, and mailed to counsel at the following address pursuant to plaintiffs assignment [DE-23-2] to her attorney of the right to payment of attorneys fees under the EAJA: Derrick Arrowood, Post Office Box 58129, Raleigh, NC 27658. If the award is subject to the Program, the balance shall be mailed to Attorney Arrowood at the above address and the check made payable to him if allowed by the Program. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/27/2024. (Horton, B.)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Thu 06/27 3:47 PM
ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the consent motion by plaintiff [DE-23] is ALLOWED. The Commissioner shall pay $5,500.00 in attorneys fees associated with this case in full satisfaction of any and all claims arising under the EAJA. Provided that the award to plaintiff is not subject to the Treasury Offset Program (Program), payment shall be made by check payable to plaintiffs counsel, Derrick Arrowood, and mailed to counsel at the following address pursuant to plaintiffs assignment [DE-23-2] to her attorney of the right to payment of attorneys fees under the EAJA: Derrick Arrowood, Post Office Box 58129, Raleigh, NC 27658. If the award is subject to the Program, the balance shall be mailed to Attorney Arrowood at the above address and the check made payable to him if allowed by the Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 6/26/2024. (Horton, B.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation Fri 06/14 7:27 AM
STIPULATION regarding23 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Kilolo Kijakazi (Parson, Cassia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/14 7:25 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Cassia W. Parson on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Parson, Cassia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
23 23 motion Attorney Fees Thu 06/13 5:54 PM
Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Jennifer Brown. Time Log, #2 B) Fee Contract, #3 C) Fee Computation, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Arrowood, Derrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 A
Friday, March 15, 2024
22 22 order Judgment Fri 03/15 4:34 PM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED that the Commissioners decision is REVERSED and this case is REMANDED to the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further administrative proceedings. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/15/2024. (Horton, B.)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Fri 03/15 4:25 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Remand: IT IS ORDERED that the Commissioners decision is REVERSED and this case is REMANDED to the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further administrative proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter a separate judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 3/15/2024. (Horton, B.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
20 20 motion Remand Thu 03/14 4:00 PM
Consent MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Kernicky, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order for Remand Under Sentence Four
Thursday, March 07, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/07 9:23 AM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendant's19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Supporting Memorandum is ALLOWED. Defendant shall have up to and including April 10, 2024 in which to file its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Supporting Memorandum. Entered by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 3/7/2024. (Horton, B.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/05 11:37 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 Social Security Plaintiff's Brief filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Kernicky, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/05 11:35 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joanne Kernicky on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Kernicky, Joanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
17 17 motion Social Security Plaintiff Brief Thu 02/08 1:41 PM
Social Security Plaintiff's Brief (Arrowood, Derrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Fri 02/02 11:08 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 2/2/2024. (Horton, B.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time-Other Thu 02/01 6:03 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Brief in a Social Security Case (Second) filed by Jennifer Brown. (Arrowood, Derrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time-Other Tue 01/02 2:18 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Brief in a Social Security Case filed by Jennifer Brown. (Arrowood, Derrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Tue 01/02 4:27 PM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the plaintiff's14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief in Her Social Security Case is allowed. Plaintiff shall have up to and including February 1, 2024 in which to file her Social Security Brief. Entered by Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers on 1/2/2024. (Horton, B.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order Wed 12/13 10:07 AM
REFERENCE ORDER: This case is referred to a United States magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Chief U.S. District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 12/12/2023. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Wed 12/13 10:36 AM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court and with the consent of the parties, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Brian S. Meyers for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Richard E. Myers II is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings should reflect the revised case number of 4:23-CV-152-BM. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/13/2023. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
12 12 misc Consent by Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 12/06 1:33 PM
CONSENT by Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi. (McNulty, Cathleen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
11 11 notice Notice-other Fri 12/01 10:45 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES Regarding Briefing Under Supplemental Rules and Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
10 10 answer Transcripts - Social Security Case Thu 11/30 11:36 AM
Transcripts - Social Security Case (McNulty, Cathleen)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Transcripts - Social Security Case Thu 11/30 11:34 AM
Transcripts - Social Security Case (McNulty, Cathleen)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/30 11:32 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Cathleen C. McNulty on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (McNulty, Cathleen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/05 10:06 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Wanda D. Mason on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Mason, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/02 4:05 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 10/2/2023. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
service Notice of Social Security Case Service Mon 10/02 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE SERVICE - This action is governed by the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Pursuant to Supplemental Rule 3, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate office within the Social Security of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of this case and Plaintiff's complaint. No summons will issue. Defendant's deadline to serve an answer or motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is governed by Supplemental Rule 4. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
utility Motion Referred Thu 09/28 9:14 AM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (McNally, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
5 5 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 4:03 PM
CORRECTED COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Jennifer Brown. (Arrowood, Derrick) Modified on 9/27/2023 to reflect that this is the corrected complaint. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 09/27 1:47 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Complaint - The caption in the complaint contains the incorrect name. Counsel is to refile the complaint correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 09/22 3:12 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Brown (Arrowood, Derrick)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 3:11 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Derrick Kyle Arrowood on behalf of Jennifer Brown. (Arrowood, Derrick)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/22 3:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jennifer Brown. (Arrowood, Derrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Jennifer Brown. (Arrowood, Derrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet