North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Robert T Numbers, II
Case #: 7:23-cv-01313
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:16 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Daniel Charles Eagles
Doj-Civ
contact info
Joseph Turner
Doj-Civ
contact info
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Donald Robinette
Represented By
William Michael Dowling
The Dowling Firm PLLC
contact info
Zina Bash
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Frederick Messner
Keller Postman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, March 22, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/22 3:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (SHORT FORM) against United States of America, filed by Donald Robinette. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Special Appearance Wed 10/18 3:53 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Zina Bash on behalf of Donald Robinette. (Bash, Zina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Tue 10/17 2:29 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit (Zina Bash) filed by Donald Robinette. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PHV Fee Receipt
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/17 4:17 PM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Zina Bash must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/17/2023. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 4:15 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Turner on behalf of United States of America. (Turner, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 4:00 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Charles Eagles on behalf of United States of America. (Eagles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 5:00 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Dowling on behalf of Donald Robinette. (Dowling, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 3:17 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick Messner on behalf of Donald Robinette. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 09/22 3:16 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Donald Robinette (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7279783.), filed by Donald Robinette. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Fri 09/22 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Fri 09/22 4:28 PM
Notice to Counsel - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]