North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Robert B Jones, Jr
Case #: 7:23-cv-01320
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:17 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Haroon Anwar
Doj-Civ
contact info
Patrick Ryan
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Allison Meredith O'Leary
Doj-Civ
contact info
Elizabeth Platt
Department Of Justice
contact info
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Floyd Comeaux
Represented By
Zina Bash
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
William Michael Dowling
The Dowling Firm PLLC
contact info
Frederick Messner
Keller Postman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, March 25, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/25 4:38 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Short Form) against United States of America, filed by Floyd Comeaux. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/16 9:45 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Allison Meredith O'Leary on behalf of United States of America. (O'Leary, Allison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/31 4:07 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Haroon Anwar on behalf of United States of America. (Anwar, Haroon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/26 1:38 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Platt on behalf of United States of America. (Platt, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Special Appearance Wed 10/18 2:13 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Zina Bash on behalf of Floyd Comeaux. (Bash, Zina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Tue 10/17 12:43 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit (Zina Bash) filed by Floyd Comeaux. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PHV Fee Receipt
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/17 3:37 PM
TEXT ORDER granting6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Zina Bash must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/17/2023. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/12 3:12 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Ryan on behalf of United States of America. (Ryan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 5:05 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Dowling on behalf of Floyd Comeaux. (Dowling, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 3:44 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick Messner on behalf of Floyd Comeaux. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 09/22 3:43 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Floyd Comeaux (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7279930.), filed by Floyd Comeaux. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Fri 09/22 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]