Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-01489
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 5:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Martinez
Defendant
Metro Police LV, NV
Defendant
UMC Medical Staff
Plaintiff
Jean-Claude West
1271869 Southern Desert Correctional Center P.O. Box 208
Indian Springs, NV 89070
Represented By
Law Library - Southern Desert CC
contact info
Law Library - High Desert State Prison
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
25 25 misc Mail Returned Wed 04/23 12:58 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable 'Paroled to Las Vegas on 1/23/25' re24 Order, sent to Jean-Claude West c/o SDCC law library. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Case Wed 04/23 10:25 AM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/22/2025. ( For Distribution by law library. ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
23 23 minord Minute Order Order on Report and Recommendation Mon 10/28 1:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/28/2024. Pending before the Court is the 16 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah, which recommends dismissing this case without prejudice because Plaintiff did not file an amended complaint by the Courts deadline. The Court entered the 22 Order Granting an Extension of Time, giving Plaintiff until March 25, 2025, to file an amended complaint. Because the Court reset the deadline to file an amended complaint, the Court REJECTS the 16 Report and Recommendation as MOOT. No further extensions will be granted to file an amended complaint. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ANH)
Related: [-]
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Mon 10/28 1:05 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Extend Time to Retain Counsel. Amended Complaint deadline: 3/25/2025. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/28/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, CC: Plaintiff's address on the docket - MAM)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 10/28 8:50 AM
MOTION for Extension of More Time to Get Counsel "Lawyer" by Plaintiff Jean-Claude West. Responses due by 11/11/2024. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Mon 10/21 3:51 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension (ECF No.19 ) is DENIED, without prejudice; provided, however, that Plaintiff is granted an additional two weeks, to November 7, 2024 , to file an objection to the recommendation to dismiss or, at his choice, a Motion to Amend together with a proposed amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/21/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
19 19 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 10/18 9:13 AM
MOTION for Extension of more time to get counsel, by Plaintiff Jean-Claude West. Responses due by 11/1/2024. (DLS) Related [+]
Related: [-] ferral
Monday, June 24, 2024
minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Mon 06/24 11:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/24/2024. Pending before the Court is the 16 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah, which recommends dismissing this case without prejudice. Also pending before the Court is the 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Retain Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Jean-Claude West. Plaintiff requests four months to obtain counsel. For good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 17 Motion is GRANTED . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to file objections to the 16 Report and Recommendation is extended to October 24, 2024, to provide Plaintiff an opportunity to obtain counsel. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
17 17 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Thu 06/13 9:26 AM
MOTION for an Extension of Time to retain Counsel, by Plaintiff Jean-Claude West. Responses due by 6/27/2024. (DLS) (amend)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
16 16 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 05/31 4:37 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's Orders. Objections to R&R due by 6/14/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/31/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Tue 04/02 2:03 PM
ORDER Adopting12 Report and Recommendations. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants in their official capacities seeking money damages are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/2/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Mon 03/18 2:22 PM
ORDER Granting13 Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 5/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/18/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 03/18 8:52 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Jean-Claude West. Responses due by 4/1/2024. (DLS) (amend)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
12 12 motion Report and Recommendation Order Tue 03/05 12:50 PM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint at1 -1 is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend, with the exception of Plaintiffs claims against Defendants in their official capacity seeking money damages, which, as stated below, should be dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff seeks to file a first amended complaint he must do so no later than April 22, 2024. The first amended complaint must be complete in and of itself. Plaintiff must include all facts and all causes of action against each defendant he wishes to name. The Court cannot rely on Plaintiffs original Complaint for any purpose when deciding whether the first amended complaint states a claim for relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to timely comply with the terms of this Order, the Court will issue a report and recommendation recommending this case be dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants in their official capacities seeking money damages be dismissed with prejudice because it is barred as a matter of law. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel Thu 02/22 3:20 PM
ORDER -IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No.10 ) is DENIED without prejudice . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos.1 ,7 ,9 ) is GRANTED ; provided, however, that in forma pauperis status will not be extended to the issuance and/or service of subpoenas at government expense. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/22/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
10 10 motion Motion Appointment of Counsel Tue 02/20 2:28 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Jean-Claude West. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
9 9 misc Financial Affidavit Wed 11/08 2:19 PM
FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Jean-Claude West. (Case No. reflected in e-filing email.) (CJS)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/08 12:30 PM
ORDER. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Notice6 , which the Court construes as a request for extension of time is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before January 16, 2024, Plaintiff must either pay the $402 filing fee for a civil action or file with the Court (1) a complete Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for Inmate; (2) a Financial Certificate properly signed by both the inmate and a prison or jail official; and (3) a copy of the inmates prison or jail trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to timely comply with this Order will result in a recommendation to dismiss this action without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court must send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for inmate along with the information and instructions for filing the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/8/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Packet - To be distributed by Law Library
Monday, November 06, 2023
7 7 notice Notice Other Tue 11/07 10:02 AM
NOTICE/Financial Certificate, by Jean-Claude West. (GA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
6 6 notice Notice Other Wed 11/01 4:06 PM
NOTICE/Update re Financial Certificate, by Jean-Claude West. (GA)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Change of Address Wed 11/01 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address, by Plaintiff Jean-Claude West. Old address: HDSP. New address: Southern Desert CC. (GA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
4 4 notice Notice Other Thu 10/05 10:32 AM
NOTICE re Submission of Financial Certificate, by Jean-Claude West. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Tue 09/26 11:32 AM
ORDER Denying1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before November 17, 2023, Plaintiff must either pay the $402 filing fee for a civil action or file with the Court a complete Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for Inmate that includes: (1) a Financial Certificate properly signed by both the inmate and a prison or jail official; and (2) a copy of Plaintiffs inmate prison or jail trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to either pay the $402 filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis on or before November 17, 2023, will result in a recommendation to dismiss this action without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will retain Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 1-1), but will not file it at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court must send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for inmate along with the information and instructions for filing the same. IFP or Payment of Filing Fees due 11/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/26/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF. Information for Filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by an Inmate ATTACHED hereto for distribution via Law Library - High Desert State Prison. - RGDG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Information for Filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by an Inmate
Friday, September 22, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Fri 09/22 3:45 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DLS)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/22 3:37 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jean-Claude West.(DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint