Village of Sodus v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04729 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Western, 6:23-cv-06494 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E I Dupont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Village of Sodus
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Terminated: 11/21/2023
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BASF Corporation.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, The 3M Company, The 3M Company, 3M Company, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). List of cases for dismissal)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by City of Florence, Charles Breaux, Michael Coates, Alex A. De Soto, Ropert Dipoli, Sandra Hankamer, Kenneth Kaufuld, George McMullin, James Parson, Michael J Richter, Kevin Rooney, Donald Wright, Applewood Community Corporation, Village of Sodus as to Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. Only Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02395-RMG, 2:23-cv-03528-RMG, 2:23-cv-04729-RMG, 2:23-cv-04739-RMG(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 09/22 12:59 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Western (associated as of 9/21/2023), 6:23-cv-06494, Village of Sodus v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04729-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:23-cv-06494. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Case electronically transferred to District of South Carolina MDL. (JHF) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/22/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
Notified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/22/2023.] | ||
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/22/2023.] | ||
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(TMK) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/22/2023.] | ||
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TMK) [Transferred from New York Western on 9/22/2023.] | ||
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |