Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 3:23-cv-00470
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Terminated:Oct 26, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 5:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Caesars Entertainment, Inc.
100 W. Liberty Street
Reno, NV 89501
Represented By
Adam Hosmer-Henner
Mcdonald Carano LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Laura McNicholas
Represented By
David C OMara
The Omara Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Anthony L. Parkhill
Barnow And Associates, P.C.
contact info
Ben Barnow
Barnow And Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas McNicholas
Represented By
David C OMara
The Omara Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Anthony L. Parkhill
Barnow And Associates, P.C.
contact info
Ben Barnow
Barnow And Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, October 26, 2023
16 16 3 pgs order Order Consolidate Cases ~Util - Terminate Case Mon 10/30 12:07 PM
ORDER to Consolidate Cases. ORDER Granting8 Motion to Consolidate Cases. It is ORDERED that 2:23-cv-01482, 2:23-cv-1483, 2:23-cv-01562, 3:23-cv-00470 is/are consolidated under 2:23-cv-01447-ART-BNW. It is ordered that the Leadership applications, pursuant to Rule 23(g)(3), shall be filed within 20 days of the date of this Order. It is ordered that the Defendant shall have 45 days from the filing of the superseding consolidated amended complaint to file a motion to dismiss or otherwise respond to that Complaint, Plaintiffs shall have 45 days thereafter to file their opposition, and Defendants shall have 30 days thereafter to file a reply in support. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
15 15 7 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 10/20 12:14 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.14 Stipulation for Extension of Time re ECF No.1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/19/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
14 14 7 pgs motion Stipulation Wed 10/11 3:27 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Caesars Entertainment, Inc.. (Hosmer-Henner, Adam) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
13 13 9 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/11 11:02 AM
ORDER APPROVING ECF No.11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ben Barnow for Laura McNicholas and Thomas McNicholas and approving Designation of Local Counsel David C. O'Mara, Esq. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/10/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
12 12 6 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/11 10:04 AM
ORDER APPROVING ECF No.10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony L. Parkhill for Laura McNicholas and Thomas McNicholas and approving Designation of Local Counsel David C. O'Mara, Esq. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/10/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
11 11 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 10/06 3:08 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ben Barnow and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David C. O'Mara (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7452467) by Plaintiffs Laura McNicholas, Thomas McNicholas. (OMara, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 10/06 3:06 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anthony L. Parkhill and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David C. O'Mara (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7452428) by Plaintiffs Laura McNicholas, Thomas McNicholas. (OMara, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
9 9 notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Thu 10/05 2:04 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES TO SINGLE DISTRICT JUDGE AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court transfer and reassign Case No. 2:23-cv-01482-CDS-EJY, Case No. 2:23-cv-01483-APG-EJY, Case No. 2:23-cv-01562-APG-EJY, and Case No. 3:23-cv-00470-MMD-CSD to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:23-cv-00470-ART-BNW . Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum, District Judge Miranda M. Du, District Judge Andrew P. Gordon, District Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/4/2023. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
8 8 notice Notice Related Cases Tue 10/03 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 3:23-cv-00470; 2:23-cv-01447; 2:23-cv-01482; 2:23-cv-01483; 2:23-cv-01562 by Plaintiffs Laura McNicholas, Thomas McNicholas. Second .(OMara, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
Friday, September 29, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/29 2:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas McNicholas, Laura McNicholas re1 Complaint,,. Caesars Entertainment, Inc. served on 9/26/2023. (OMara, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
6 6 notice Notice Related Cases Tue 09/26 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 3:23-cv-00470; 2:23-cv-01447 by Plaintiffs Laura McNicholas, Thomas McNicholas. .(OMara, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
4 4 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 09/26 10:04 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Laura McNicholas, Thomas McNicholas that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (OMara, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/26 7:20 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caesars Entertainment, Inc. re ECF No.2 Proposed summons. (DRM)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 09/26 2:06 PM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DRM)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Tue 09/26 3:52 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
2 2 service Proposed Summons to be issued Mon 09/25 11:06 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiffs Laura McNicholas, Thomas McNicholas. (OMara, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/22 6:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7436861) by Thomas McNicholas, Laura McNicholas. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/2/2023. Proof of service due by 12/21/2023. (OMara, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet