California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00182
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 24, 2023 12:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Roosevelt James Maldonado, III (1)
Represented By
Christina Marie Corcoran
Office Of The Federal Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Robert Veneman-Hughes
Doj-Usao
contact info
Fresno Forfeiture Unit
United States Attorney'S Office, Fresno
contact info

GPO Sep 13 2023
DETENTION ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/12/2023 as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III. (Rooney, M)[1:23-mj-00107-SKO]
GPO Nov 02 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/2/2023. IT IS SO ORDERED that the status conference is continued from November 8, 2023, to January 10, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A) and 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). (Vue, Yee)
GPO Jan 04 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Status Conference as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/4/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from January 10, 2024, to March 13, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A) and 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Mar 07 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Status Conference as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/07/2024. IT IS SO ORDERED that the status conference is continued from March 13, 2024, to April 24, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A) and 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). (Lopez Amador, Corina)
GPO Apr 18 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Status Conference as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from April 24, 2024, to May 22, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A) and 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO May 17 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Vacate Status Conference and Set for Change of Plea as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/17/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference set for May 22, 2024, is vacated. A change of plea hearing is set for July 29, 2024, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before the District Court Judge. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A) and 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Jul 23 2024
STIPULATION TO VACATE CHANGE OF PLEA AND SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/23/2024 as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III (1). The Change of Plea Hearing set for July 29, 2024, is vacated. A Status Conference is set for September 25, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A) and 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). (Yang, Pa Gnia)
GPO Sep 19 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Status Conference as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/19/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from September 25, 2024, to November 13, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A) and 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(B)(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Nov 08 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Status Conference as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/8/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from November 13, 2024, to February 26, 2025, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)

Docket last updated: 09/24/2023 1:22 AM PDT
Friday, September 08, 2023
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Roosevelt Maldonado (1). (Lawrence, A) [1:23-mj-00107-SKO]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
3 3 SHACKLING MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/12/2023: Pursuant to Local Rule 401, the Court hereby determined that the appropriate restraint level for Roosevelt Maldonado is Fully Shackled (USM # 77227-510). (Rooney, M) [1:23-mj-00107-SKO]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: INITIAL APPEARANCE ON COMPLAINT as to Roosevelt Maldonado held on 9/12/2023. The Court noted the hearing was conducted via video conference pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 5 and/or 10. Defendant and counsel consented to the appearance by video. Upon review of defendant's financial affidavit, the Office of the Federal Defender was appointed. Defendant advised of charges/rights; reading/advisement waived; DENIAL ENTERED. TRUE NAME FINDING AS FOLLOWS: ROOSEVELT JAMES MALDONADO, III. As the government requested detention, and as defense counsel submitted on the matter, the Court ORDERED DEFENDANT DETAINED. PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION HEARING set for 9/21/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Government Counsel: Robert Veneman-Hughes present. Defense Counsel: Christina Corcoran present. Custody Status: (Custody) (FCJ) (Fully Shackled) (Zoom) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Corina Lopez Amador. (Rooney, M) [1:23-mj-00107-SKO]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
5 5 DETENTION ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/12/2023 as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III. (Rooney, M) [1:23-mj-00107-SKO]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
6 6 NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christina Marie Corcoran appearing for Roosevelt James Maldonado, III. Attorney Corcoran, Christina Marie added. (Corcoran, Christina) [1:23-mj-00107-SKO]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 INDICTMENT as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III (1) count(s) 1. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 True Bill and Defendant Information Sheet
8 8 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: ARRAIGNMENT AND PLEA re INDICTMENT as to Roosevelt James Maldonado, III held on 9/21/2023. Defendant is advised of charges and rights. Defendant acknowledged receipt of the indictment and waives formal reading and statutory and constitutional rights. True Name stated as charged; NOT GUILTY PLEA ENTERED AND DENIAL of the forfeiture allegations. Discovery/reciprocal requested and ORDERED. The court instructed government counsel under Rule 5(f) to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland. Status Conference Hearing set for 11/08/2023 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. XT Start: 09/21/2023 Stop: 11/08/2023 - Time is to be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act in that good cause exists and that the ends of justice outweigh the interest of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. For the reasons set forth on the record, the continuance requested is granted for good cause and the Court finds the ends of justice outweigh the interest of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. Government Counsel: Robert Veneman-Hughes present. Defense Counsel: Christina Corcoran present. Custody Status: CUSTODY - FCJ (IN PERSON). Court Reporter/CD Number: Otilia Rosales. (Nguyen, J)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER (TEXT ONLY) as to Defendant Roosevelt James Maldonado III, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 09/21/2023: According to the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure Rule 5(f), the government is ordered to comply with its discovery obligations as required by federal law, including those duties imposed by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions interpreting Brady . This order does not relieve any party of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating this order or the government's obligations under Brady may include sanctions, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges, among other consequences. (Nguyen, J)
Related: [-]