Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-30351
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 24, 2023 3:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Stephen Lewis Gentry (1)
Represented By
Federal Community Defender
contact info
David C. Tholen
Federal Defender Office
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Christopher Rawsthorne
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/24/2023 3:55 AM EDT
Friday, August 25, 2023
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Initial Appearance as to Stephen Lewis Gentry held on 8/25/2023. Detention Hearing set for 8/29/2023 01:00 PM Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Benton Martin) (AUSA: Philip Ross) (EBut)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand as to Stephen Lewis Gentry (1). (DPer)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Stephen Lewis Gentry held on 8/25/2023 before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.2 MB) (NAhm)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Stephen Lewis Gentry. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Stephen Lewis Gentry. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Stephen Lewis Gentry Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm)
Related: [-]