Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:23-cv-01501
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 1:58 AM PDT
Defendant
Spring Oaks Shopping Center, LLC
Plaintiff
William Eddins
Represented By
David J Martin
David J. Martin
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 07/02 9:09 AM
Civil Case Terminated per14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
14 14 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Mon 07/01 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff William Eddins. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Fri 06/28 10:55 AM
ORDER. While the Court will not impose monetary sanctions in the circumstances presented, both Plaintiff William Eddins and attorney David J. Martin are CAUTIONED that all deadlines and Court orders must be followed moving forward. Failure to do so may result in the imposition of monetary and other significant sanctions, up to and including case-dispositive sanctions. In all other respects,11 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. Dismissal papers must be filed by 7/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/28/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
12 12 misc Response Order to Show Cause Mon 06/24 2:12 PM
RESPONSE to11 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff William Eddins. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Show Cause Mon 06/17 2:24 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff William Eddins and Attorney David J. Martin to show cause in writing, no later than June 24, 2024, why they should not be sanctioned in a Court fine of up to $1,000 each for violating the Courts order (Docket No. 10). See, e.g., Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f)(1)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/17/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
minord Minute Order Thu 05/16 10:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/16/2024. Plaintiff filed a notice of settlement. Docket No. 9. Dismissal papers must be filed by June 14, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
9 9 misc Settlement Agreement Wed 05/15 10:44 AM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Plaintiff William Eddins. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/22 1:31 PM
ORDER to respond to complaint. Spring Oaks Shopping Center, LLC answer due 5/15/2024. The Court also ORDERS Plaintiff to serve this order on the defense and to file a proof of service by 4/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/19 1:19 PM
ORDER. Show Cause Response due by 5/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
6 6 misc Case Management Report Mon 04/15 5:04 PM
First CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff William Eddins. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/09 2:03 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must file Status Report due by 4/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/9/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/26 12:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Eddins. Spring Oaks Shopping Center, LLC served on 10/18/2023. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/26 8:37 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Spring Oaks Shopping Center, LLC re1 Complaint. (JQC)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 09/26 8:35 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 09/25 5:15 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by William Eddins that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/25 5:14 AM
COMPLAINT against Spring Oaks Shopping Center, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7437117) by William Eddins. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/5/2023. Proof of service due by 12/24/2023. (Martin, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons