17 West Pine Street, LLC
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 6:14-bk-12240 |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2014 |
Dismissed: | Apr 06, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
1. | Downtown nightclub building owner files for bankruptcy (orlandosentinel.com) |
Submitted Fri 11/07/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 04/06/2015 8:00 PM EDT |
Saturday, November 01, 2014 | ||
crditcrd
none
Sat 11/01 2:59 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:14-bk-12240) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 43032575, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Aldo G Bartolone Jr on behalf of 17 West Pine Street, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 03/1/2015 Disclosure Statement due by 03/1/2015 (Bartolone, Aldo) |