Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-90739

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:23-ap-03213
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 23, 2023
Terminated:Feb 05, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc.
3322 West End Ave., Ste. 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Ironroc Energy Partners, LLC
3322 West End Ave., Suite 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Ironroc Energy Partners, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ageron Ironroc Energy, LLC
3322 West End Ave., Ste. 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Ageron Ironroc Energy, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Alpine Carbon, LLC
3322 West End Ave., Ste. 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Alpine Carbon, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ageron Energy II, LLC
3322 West End Ave., Ste. 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Ageron Energy II, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Alpine Summit Energy Investors, Inc.
3322 West End Ave., Ste. 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Alpine Summit Energy Investors, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
HB2 Origination, LLC
3322 West End Ave., Ste. 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
HB2 Origination, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Craig Perry
3322 West Eve Avenue Suite 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Craig Perry
contact info
Defendant
Darren Moulds
3322 West Eve Avenue, Suite 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Darren Moulds
contact info
Defendant
William Wicker
3322 West Eve Avenue, Suite 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
William Wicker
contact info
Defendant
Travis Reagan Brown
3322 West Eve Avenue, Suite 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Travis Reagan Brown
contact info
Defendant
Chrystie Holmstrom
3322 West Eve Avenue, Suite 450
Nashville, TN 37203
Represented By
Chrystie Holmstrom
contact info
Defendant
Michael McCoy
55 West Double Green Circle
The Woodlands, TX 77382
Represented By
Michael McCoy
contact info
Plaintiff
Alpine Summit Funding, LLC
Represented By
Aaron D Davidson
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Daniel Geoghan
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
98 98 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/07 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 02/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 97 Order Dismissing Adversary Case
Monday, February 05, 2024
97 97 order Dismissing Adversary Case Mon 02/05 3:42 PM
Dismissal, Signed on 2/5/2024 Related [+] (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 96 Courtroom Minutes
96 96 court Courtroom Minutes Mon 02/05 3:19 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 1:28 PM - 2:57 PM. Cases 4:23-ap-03213 and 4:23-bk-90739 called concurrently. Audio filed in main case no. 23-90739 Appearances: (see attached). Additional appearances: Mark Castillo present. Doug Uloth for San Roman Ranch Mineral Partners, Ltd. The Court heard oral argument. Exhibits admitted: ECF no. 1501 2-4. ECF no. 1534 1. ECF no. 1535 1. Witnesses sworn in and testimony given: Ryan Bouley. Adversary proceeding case no. 23-03213 dismissed; order signed on the record. Motion28 deemed moot as stated on the record. Motion ECF no. 1470 in main case no. 23-90739 continued to 2/22/24 at 3:00 PM. Motions ECF nos. 1332, 1441, 1442, 1517 in main case no. 23-90739 granted; orders signed on the record. Motion ECF no. 1186 in main case no. 23-90739 withdrawn on the record. Status conference set in adversary case no. 24-3009 on 02/22/24 at 3:00 PM. Related [+] (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 8 Order for Conference,28 Generic Motion
Friday, February 02, 2024
95 95 misc Statement Fri 02/02 1:18 PM
Statement related to the Supplement to the Motions to Dismiss (Filed By Alpine Summit Funding, LLC ) Related [+] (Wooten, Ryan)
Related: [-] 92 Motion to Dismiss Case
Thursday, February 01, 2024
94 94 3 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 02/01 2:15 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Michael McCoy, Craig Perry, Darren Moulds, William Wicker, Travis Reagan Brown, and Chrystie Holmstrom Filed by Alpine Summit Funding, LLC (Wooten, Ryan)
Related: [-]
93 93 misc Exhibit List Thu 02/01 11:42 AM
Exhibit List, Witness List (Filed By Alpine Summit Funding, LLC ). (Wooten, Ryan)
Related: [-]