California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:23-cv-04900
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Aug 16, 2024
Case in other court:San Mateo County Superior Court, 23-CIV-03953
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 1:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Jet Aviation Flight Services, Inc.
Represented By
Ashlee Nicole Cherry
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Andrew Paul Frederick
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Brian D, Berry
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Edwin Kapitanski
Represented By
London Dale Meservy
Meservy Law, P.C.
contact info
Matthew S. Dente
Dente Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 16, 2024
43 43 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/16 10:39 AM
ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/16/2024. ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/13 1:20 PM
NOTICE by Jet Aviation Flight Services, Inc. OF SETTLEMENT (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
41 41 motion Discovery Letter Brief Mon 07/29 4:57 PM
Discovery Letter Brief filed by Jet Aviation Flight Services, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
40 40 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 07/09 10:20 AM
ORDER. The parties' requests to modify the scheduling order are denied. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/9/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
39 39 order Order Tue 07/09 10:13 AM
ORDER. For Dkt. No. 37, defendant Jet Aviation Flight Services is directed to file a responsive letter brief by July 29, 2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/9/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
38 38 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 07/08 10:02 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Edwin Kapitanski.(Meservy, London)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF LONDON D. MESERVY IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULING ORDER; [PROPOSED] ORDER
Thursday, June 27, 2024
37 37 motion Discovery Letter Brief Thu 06/27 11:41 AM
Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories Nos. 1, 2, 3, 15, and 16 filed by Edwin Kapitanski. (Meservy, London)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
36 36 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 06/13 4:46 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byJet Aviation Flight Services, Inc..(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-] 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment
Att: 1 Supplement Declaration of Anthony Carmagnola,
Att: 2 Supplement Declaration of Carrie Krott,
Att: 3 Declaration of Andrew P. Frederick
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
35 35 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 06/04 5:35 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byEdwin Kapitanski.(Meservy, London)
Related: [-] 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF EDWIN KAPITANSKI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JET AVIATION FLIGHT SERVICES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT,
Att: 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. DENTE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JET AVIATION FLIGHT SERVICES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
34 34 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 05/28 3:51 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CASE SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Edwin Kapitanski.(Meservy, London)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF LONDON D. MESERVY IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CASE SCHEDULING ORDER; [PROPOSED] ORDER
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
33 33 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 05/22 2:54 PM
ORDER. For Dkt. No. 32, plaintiff Kapitanski may oppose defendant Jet Aviation Flight Services' motion for summary judgment by June 4, 2024. Jet Aviation Flight Services may file a reply by June 13, 2024. A hearing on the motion will be set if warranted. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/22/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
32 32 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 05/15 4:33 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION filed by Edwin Kapitanski.(Meservy, London)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF LONDON D. MESERVY IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION; [PROPOSED] ORDER
Thursday, May 09, 2024
31 31 oth_sup Exhibits Thu 05/09 4:32 PM
EXHIBITS re30 Request for Judicial Notice (Exhibit 11) filed byJet Aviation Flight Services, Inc.. Related [+] (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-] 30
30 30 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Thu 05/09 4:20 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re1 Notice of Removal, filed byJet Aviation Flight Services, Inc.. Related [+] (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1
29 29 oth_sup Declaration in Support Thu 05/09 4:18 PM
Declaration of Carrie Krott in Support of1 Notice of Removal, filed byJet Aviation Flight Services, Inc.. Related [+] (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit 7 - Captain Falcon 900 Job Posting,
Att: 2 Exhibit 8 - Kapitanski Offer Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit 9 - Kapitanski New Hire Documents,
Att: 4 Exhibit 10 - Kapitanski Exit Document
28 28 oth_sup Declaration in Support Thu 05/09 4:15 PM
Declaration of Anthony Carmagnola in Support of1 Notice of Removal, filed byJet Aviation Flight Services, Inc.. Related [+] (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - FAA Approval Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Pilot Training and Checking Requirements,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Part 135 Training Program -- Falcon 900 Series,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Captain Falcon 900 Job Posting,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 -Kapitanski Training Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Kapitanski Release Email
27 27 motion Summary Judgment Thu 05/09 4:09 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jet Aviation Flight Services, Inc.. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 6/13/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/23/2024. Replies due by 5/30/2024.(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 09, 2024
26 26 order Case Management Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/09 11:28 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/8/2024. Close of Expert Discovery due by 11/29/2024. Close of Fact Discovery due by 10/4/2024. Designation of Experts due by 10/18/2024. Dispositive Motion due by 4/4/2025. Rebuttal Reports due by 11/1/2024. Jury Selection set for 8/25/2025 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2025 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/9/2024. (lrc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
25 25 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 02/06 12:29 PM
ORDER. The parties' stipulated protective order, Dkt. No. 23, is approved, except that in those cases where the stipulated protective order conflicts with the Court's standing orders (e.g., with respect to the filing of discovery motions), the Court's standing orders will control. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/6/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
24 24 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 02/05 10:38 AM
ORDER. The case management conference that was set for February 8, 2024, is vacated, and the Court will issue a scheduling order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/5/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
23 23 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 02/02 9:46 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order filed by Edwin Kapitanski. (Meservy, London)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
22 22 misc Case Management Statement Thu 02/01 10:57 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Jet Aviation Flight Services, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
21 21 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 01/23 11:16 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
20 20 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 01/19 3:06 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff Edwin Kapitanski (Meservy, London)
Related: [-]
19 19 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Fri 01/19 10:53 AM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
18 18 respoth Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 01/18 11:50 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint16 Amended Complaint (First) by Jet Aviation Flight Services, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
17 17 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 01/05 10:34 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Edwin Kapitanski (Meservy, London)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/19 1:01 PM
FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Jet Aviation Flight Services, Inc.. Filed by Edwin Kapitanski. (Meservy, London)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
15 15 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 12/12 4:24 PM
ORDER. For Dkt. No. 14, plaintiff Kapitanski will file a first amended complaint by December 21, 2023. Defendant Jet Aviation Flight Services will respond by January 18, 2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/12/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 12/08 10:27 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Allow Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint filed by Edwin Kapitanski. (Meservy, London)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
13 13 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 11/13 6:24 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/13/2024. (lrc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/09 11:47 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/9/23.(as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
11 11 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 11/09 9:54 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/9/2023. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
10 10 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 11/08 7:39 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for an Order Allowing Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint filed by Edwin Kapitanski. (Meservy, London)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 10/10 2:37 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/10 1:10 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/10/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Friday, October 06, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 10/06 4:52 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/05 11:39 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edwin Kapitanski.. (Meservy, London)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 09/27 1:07 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2023 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
4 4 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 09/25 3:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jet Aviation Flight Services, Inc. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/25 3:39 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Jet Aviation Flight Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Jet Aviation Holdings USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Jet Aviation International, Inc. for Jet Aviation Flight Services, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/25 2:59 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 09/25 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 23-CIV-03953. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18676380). Filed byJet Aviation Flight Services, Inc..(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Other Case Initiating Documents,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Jet Aviation's Answer to Complaint,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Wed 09/27 1:11 PM
Answer to Removal Complaint (Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) byJet Aviation Flight Services, Inc. - [Pls. Refer to Document [1-3], Page 2 of 11] (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]