Idaho District Court
Judge:David C Nye
Case #: 1:23-cv-00423
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 2:28 AM MDT
Defendant
Biomark, LLC
Represented By
Daniel V. Kitzes
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Maureen Louise Mitchell
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Christin Anne Lawler
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By
Daniel V. Kitzes
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Maureen Louise Mitchell
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Christin Anne Lawler
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan James Richmond
Represented By
Mallam John Prior
Rossman Law Group
contact info
Eric S Rossman
Rossman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Erica S Phillips
Rossman Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, March 14, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/14 3:44 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees and costs except as expressly agreed between the Plaintiff and Defendants in their Settlement Agreement, Waiver of Claims, and Release dated February 4, 2025. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 03/11 1:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Ryan James Richmond. (Rossman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
22 22 order Order Tue 02/18 9:00 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. The Parties have notified the Court they have reached a tentative settlement in this matter. Dkt.21 . Accordingly, all deadlines are stayed pending finalization of the settlement. Dismissal paperwork is due on or before March 21, 2025. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/14 9:08 AM
NOTICE by Biomark, LLC, Merck & Co., Inc. - Notice of Settlement (Mitchell, Maureen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
20 20 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 10/30 2:46 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: The Court has reviewed the reasons offered in support of entry of this StipulatedProtective Order and finds that there is good cause to protect the confidential nature of certain information. Accordingly, the Court adopts the above Stipulated Protective Order in this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/02 9:24 AM
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: All dispositive motions to be filed by November 20, 2024 shall be due by May 13, 2025. The parties have chosen to participate in either mediation or a settlement conference. ADR to be held by August 22, 2024 shall be due by February 6, 2025.All factual discovery to be completed by October 21, 2024 shall be due by April 7, 2025. Except as expressly modified by this Stipulation, all other provisions of the initial Discovery Plan (Dkt.13 ) and Scheduling Order (Dkt.14 ) entered on January 31, 2024 shall not be changed. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants request the Court enter a revised Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan consistent with the dates set forth herein. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation Wed 07/31 2:18 PM
STIPULATION re14 Scheduling Order,,13 Discovery Plan to Extend Deadlines by Ryan James Richmond. (Rossman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/22 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel V. Kitzes on behalf of All Defendants (Kitzes, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
16 16 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Thu 03/21 7:37 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Daniel V. Kitzes for Merck & Co., Biomark, LLC. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Pro Hac Vice Appearance Thu 03/21 6:38 AM
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Daniel V. Kitzes. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2724421.)Maureen Louise Mitchell appearing for Defendants Biomark, LLC, Merck & Co., Inc.. Responses due by 4/11/2024 (Mitchell, Maureen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/31 2:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER (Standard Track) - IT IS SO ORDERED that telephonic scheduling conference on February 23, 2024 is VACATED. The following deadlines and procedures will govern this litigation: All dispositive motions shall be filed by November 20, 2024. All motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, shall be filed on or before May 24, 2024.ADR must be held by August 22, 2024. All factual discovery will be completed by October 21, 2024. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
13 13 misc Discovery Plan Tue 01/30 4:42 PM
DISCOVERY PLAN by Ryan James Richmond re12 Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan Joint . (Rossman, Eric)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form Tue 01/30 4:41 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Ryan James Richmond. (Rossman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
11 11 order Litigation Order Wed 01/10 12:23 PM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before February 16, 2024, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2024 09:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
utility Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents Tue 12/19 5:43 PM
The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (ac)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
10 10 misc Consent Filed Fri 10/20 5:15 PM
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Availability Setting Deadline Thu 10/19 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Biomark, LLC, Merck & Co., Inc., Ryan James Richmond re. dkt7 Answer to Complaint, and dkt1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/18/2023. (ac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
8 8 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Thu 10/19 9:20 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving dkt.6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Christin Anne Lawler for Biomark, LLC,and Merck & Co., Inc. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/18 1:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Biomark, LLC, Merck & Co., Inc..(Mitchell, Maureen)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Appearance Wed 10/18 1:12 PM
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Christin Anne Lawler. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2646569.)Maureen Louise Mitchell appearing for Defendants Biomark, LLC, Merck & Co., Inc.. Responses due by 11/8/2023 (Mitchell, Maureen)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/18 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Louise Mitchell on behalf of Biomark, LLC, Merck & Co., Inc. (Mitchell, Maureen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
4 4 service Certificate of Service Tue 10/10 2:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ryan James Richmond re1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued to Merck & Co., Inc. (Rossman, Eric)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Certificate of Service Tue 10/10 2:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ryan James Richmond re1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued to Biomark, LLC (Rossman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/26 10:01 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.)(ac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons-2
Monday, September 25, 2023
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/25 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Biomark, LLC, Merck & Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2634371.), filed by Ryan James Richmond.(Rossman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Biomark LLC,
Att: 2 Summons Merck & Co., Inc.,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet