Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:23-cv-01509
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District, A-23-863412-C
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 1:59 AM PDT
Defendant
BPC Henderson, LLC
Defendant
FC QIC Galleria at Sunset JV, LLC
Defendant
Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Paul Acker
Resnick & Louis, P.C.
contact info
Matthew B. Beckstead
Resnick & Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Staci Robinson
David Boehrer Law Firm 375 N. Stephanie Street Suite 711
Henderson, NV 89014
Represented By
Travis Rich
David Boehrer Law Firm
contact info
David D. Boehrer
David Boehrer Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
minord Minute Order Wed 07/24 2:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/24/2024. Based on the plaintiff's status report 32 , which clarifies that all claims and parties have been dismissed, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
32 32 misc Status Report Fri 06/07 1:00 PM
First STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Staci Robinson. (Boehrer, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 06/06 10:07 AM
ORDER granting30 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice Claims against Defendant Macy's. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the claims against Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must file a status report by June 17, 2024, advising the court of how she intends to proceed against these remaining parties and whether and when they were served with process. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/6/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
30 30 motion Stipulation Tue 06/04 3:33 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC. (Beckstead, Matthew) (dismiss)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice Other Tue 06/04 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC. (Beckstead, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
28 28 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 04/23 10:53 AM
ORDER Granting27 Stipulation for FRCP 35 Examination of Plaintiff Staci Robinson. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants may proceed with having a medical examiner conduct an FRCP 35 Examination of Plaintiff Staci Robinson pursuant to FRCP 35 and in accordance with the terms of the above Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/22/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KMB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
27 27 motion Stipulation Fri 04/19 12:00 PM
STIPULATION FOR FRCP 35 EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF STACI ROBINSON by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC. (Beckstead, Matthew) (other) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 04/08 11:37 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice ECF No.20 MOTION to Compel Rule 35 Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
25 25 respm Reply Thu 04/04 6:43 PM
REPLY to Response to20 Motion to Compel, by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC.(Beckstead, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
24 24 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Wed 04/03 2:00 PM
NON-OPPOSITION to20 Motion to Compel, by Plaintiff Staci Robinson. (Boehrer, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Scheduling Order Tue 04/02 2:25 PM
ORDER Granting16 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery due by 8/22/2024. Motions due by 9/23/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/2/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice Other Tue 04/02 7:54 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Response by Staci Robinson re16 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time. (Boehrer, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
minord Minute Order Fri 03/29 1:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/29/2024. Re: 20 Motion to Compel. Defendant's motion to compel indicates that Plaintiff has not yet responded to Defendant's request to stipulate to a Rule 35 examination and that Plaintiff's counsel "is considering reversing his opposition to extending deadlines but appears to be waiting on his client's approval to do so." Given this uncertainty, the Court will require expedited briefing. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion on or before April 3, 2024. That response must inform the Court whether Plaintiff is willing to stipulate to a Rule 35 examination and/or Defendant's requested extension of discovery in ECF No. 16 . Defendant shall reply on or before April 5, 2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
20 20 motion Motion Compel Thu 03/28 10:10 AM
MOTION to Compel Rule 35 Examination by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 4/11/2024.(Beckstead, Matthew) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Monday, March 25, 2024
19 19 respm Reply Mon 03/25 5:42 PM
REPLY to Response to16 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC.(Beckstead, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Monday, March 18, 2024
18 18 respm Response Mon 03/18 2:38 PM
RESPONSE to16 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff Staci Robinson. Replies due by 3/25/2024.(Boehrer, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index Index of Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1. Plaintiff's Responses to Federal Interrogatories,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2. Plaintiff's Responses to State Interrogatories
Friday, March 15, 2024
17 17 notice Notice Other Fri 03/15 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S FRCP 26(a)(2)(C) DISCLOSURES by Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC.. (Beckstead, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
16 16 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 03/04 5:08 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re13 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 3/18/2024. (Beckstead, Matthew) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/28 12:11 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC.(Beckstead, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 02/28 11:36 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.11 Motion to Amend. Macy's shall file and serve its amended pleading as required under Local Rule 15-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/27/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
13 13 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Thu 01/04 3:33 PM
ORDER Granting12 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 5/24/2024. Motions due by 6/24/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
12 12 motion Stipulation Wed 01/03 1:00 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC. (Beckstead, Matthew) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
11 11 motion Motion Amend/Correct Tue 12/26 7:34 PM
MOTION to Amend10 Errata by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 1/9/2024.(Beckstead, Matthew) (answer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Sunday, November 26, 2023
10 10 misc Errata Sun 11/26 12:13 PM
ERRATA to5 Status Report by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC..(Beckstead, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Friday, November 03, 2023
9 9 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Fri 11/03 2:21 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DLS)
Related: [-]
8 8 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 11/03 2:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No.7 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/25/2024 . Dispositive Motions due by 4/24/2024 . Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/24/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/3/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
7 7 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 11/02 3:05 PM
Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Staci Robinson.. (Boehrer, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 10/20 10:52 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Staci Robinson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Boehrer, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
5 5 misc Status Report Thu 10/19 11:03 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC.. (Beckstead, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
4 4 misc Statement in Removal Case Fri 09/29 4:12 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC.. (Beckstead, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
3 3 minord Minute Order Removal Case Tue 09/26 10:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/26/2023. By Deputy Clerk: R. Gador. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/11/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 09/26 10:37 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 09/25 5:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Macy's Retail Holding LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (Beckstead, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Mon 09/25 5:13 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-23-863412-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7438514) by Macy's Retail Holding LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/5/2023. (Beckstead, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Notice of Removasl,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet