California Central District Court
Case #: 5:23-cv-01958
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Sep 28, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 1:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Progressive Management Systems
Defendant
Khaldoun Debian, M.D.
Defendant
Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian
Defendant
Pavilion Surgery Center LLC
Defendant
Thunderbird Collection Specialists Inc.
Plaintiff
Marissa Hernandez
Represented By
Youssef Hussein Hammoud
Hammoud Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Thursday, September 28, 2023
8 8 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Thu 09/28 9:19 AM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:23-cv-01816 CJC (JDEx). (sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
7 7 misc Miscellaneous Document Mon 09/25 4:15 PM
Summons filed by Plaintiff Marissa Hernandez (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Miscellaneous Document Mon 09/25 4:14 PM
Summons filed by Plaintiff Marissa Hernandez (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Miscellaneous Document Mon 09/25 4:13 PM
Summons filed by Plaintiff Marissa Hernandez (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Miscellaneous Document Mon 09/25 4:12 PM
Summons filed by Plaintiff Marissa Hernandez (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 09/25 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marissa Hernandez, identifying HOAG MEMORIAL HOSPITAL PRESBYTERIAN, KHALDOUN DEBIAN, M.D., A MEDICAL CORPORATION, THUNDERBIRD COLLECTION SPECIALISTS, INC., PAVILION SURGERY CENTER, LLC, and PROGRESSIVE MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS. (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 09/25 4:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marissa Hernandez. (Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 09/25 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36102260 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Marissa Hernandez. (Attorney Youssef Hussein Hammoud added to party Marissa Hernandez(pty:pla))(Hammoud, Youssef)
Related: [-]