Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Referred: J Elizabeth Mcbath
Case #: 1:23-cv-04293
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2023
Terminated:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:05 AM EDT
Defendant
GFL Environmental, Inc.
Represented By
Richard W. Black
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Barry Hartstein
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Pierre-Joseph Noebes
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
Transwaste Services, LLC
Represented By
Richard W. Black
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Barry Hartstein
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Pierre-Joseph Noebes
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC
Represented By
Richard W. Black
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Barry Hartstein
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Pierre-Joseph Noebes
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC
Represented By
Richard W. Black
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Barry Hartstein
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Pierre-Joseph Noebes
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By
Veronica R Cox
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Meeta T. Dama
Us Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Adam T. Mills
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, October 21, 2024
35 35 30+ pgs order Order Mon 10/21 1:34 PM
CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/21/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
34 34 misc Proposed Consent Order Fri 10/11 5:11 PM
Proposed CONSENT ORDER.(Cox, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree
Monday, August 12, 2024
33 33 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Mon 08/12 11:11 AM
ORDER: In light of the pending settlement, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for docket management purposes. The parties are ORDERED to file the appropriate documents to dispose of the case within sixty days. Absent an extension or further order of the Court, if no request to reopen the case is made within sixty days, the Court may dismiss the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/12/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 08/12 11:13 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath terminated from case. (gww)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time Thu 08/08 6:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of the Current Stay to Attend Second Private Mediation with Brief In Support by GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC.(Black, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 06/26 4:38 PM
Submission of28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
31 31 respm Response (Non-Motion) Tue 06/25 3:43 PM
RESPONSE re30 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mills, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
30 30 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendation Tue 06/11 7:18 PM
OBJECTIONS to28 Report and Recommendation filed by GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC.(Black, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Tue 05/28 12:11 PM
ORDER for Service of28 Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 5/28/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 05/28 12:11 PM
NON-FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 5/28/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
27 27 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 05/28 12:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART26 Motion for Temporary Stay of Litigation to Attend Private Mediation. The parties' obligations to hold their Rule 26(f) conference and to file their JPRDP and initial disclosures are STAYED. This stay shall automatically lift on the date Defendants file their answer to Plaintiff's operative complaint. Otherwise, a stay is unnecessary at this juncture, but the parties may renew their request after Defendants have answered the complaint. Additionally, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report on the outcome of their August 5, 2024, mediation on or before August 12, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 5/28/2024. (tas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
26 26 motion Stay Fri 05/24 8:20 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion for Temporary Stay of Litigation to Attend Private Mediation with Brief In Support by GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC.(Black, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 01, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 02/01 10:14 AM
Submission of16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
25 25 respm Reply Brief Wed 01/31 2:56 PM
REPLY BRIEF re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pattern or Practice Claims and Improperly Named Defendants - Reply Brief in Support filed by GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC. (Black, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 01/25 1:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING23 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendants shall have through and including 1/31/2024, to file their reply in support of their16 motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 1/25/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time Wed 01/24 4:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply by GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC.(Black, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order for extension of time for Defendants to file their Reply in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pattern or Practice Claims and Improperly Named Defendants
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/24 3:25 PM
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to the parties resubmitting their extension request with this deficiency corrected if they so choose. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 1/24/2024. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/23 6:08 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Response /Reply in support by GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC.(Black, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order for Defendants to file their Reply in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pattern or Practice Claims and Improperly Named Defendants
Friday, January 05, 2024
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/05 3:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pattern or Practice Claims and Improperly Named Defendants filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Mills, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 12/27 7:24 PM
Clerk's Notation re17 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 12/27/2023. (nav)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 12/21 11:54 AM
ORDER GRANTING18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Briefing Schedule Following Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have through and including 1/5/2024, to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss, and Defendants shall have through and including 1/26/2024, to reply to that response. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 12/21/2023. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
18 18 motion Extension of Time Tue 12/19 4:04 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOLLOWING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS with Brief In Support by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Mills, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 12/15 11:00 AM
Clerk's Notation re17 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/11 8:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC for Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC; Corporate Parent GFL Wrangler US 4, LLC for Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC. (Black, Richard)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/11 7:53 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pattern or Practice Claims and Improperly Named Defendants with Brief In Support by GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC.(Black, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Christine Ladd EEOC Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - EEOC Notice of Expansion of Investigation,
Att: 4 Exihibit C - EEOC Determination
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 11/29 8:55 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:15 APPLICATION for Admission of Barry Hartstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13056056). Attorney Barry Hartstein added appearing on behalf of GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/29 10:16 AM
ORDER granting15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Barry Hartstein. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 11/29/23. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
15 15 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/28 1:41 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Barry Hartstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13056056).by GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC.(Black, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, November 27, 2023
14 14 misc Letter re:83.1 Mon 11/27 11:43 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Barry Hartstein. Clerk to follow-up by 12/7/2023. (djs)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/27 9:58 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC with Jury Demand filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(nmb)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 11/27 9:54 AM
ORDER GRANTING8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket Plaintiff's proposed First Amended Complaint, (Doc. 8-2),as the operative pleading in this matter. Defendants shall have through and including 12/11/2023, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 11/27/2023. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/20 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pierre-Joseph Noebes on behalf of GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC (Noebes, Pierre-Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/20 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Black on behalf of GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC (Black, Richard)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Response to Motion Mon 11/20 4:43 PM
RESPONSE re8 MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT - Notice of Non-Opposition filed by GFL Environmental, Inc., Transwaste Services, LLC, Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC, Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC. (Black, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
8 8 motion Leave to File Document Thu 11/09 2:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT with Brief In Support by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Mills, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/31 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam T. Mills on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Mills, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
6 6 misc Leave of Absence Fri 10/20 1:33 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 11/08/2023, 04/03/2024, by Veronica R Cox.(Cox, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 12, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/12 8:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waste Industries U.S.A., LLC waiver mailed on 9/28/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Cox, Veronica)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/12 8:33 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Waste Industries Atlanta, LLC waiver mailed on 9/28/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Cox, Veronica)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/12 8:29 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Transwaste Services, LLC waiver mailed on 9/28/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Cox, Veronica)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/12 8:26 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. GFL Environmental, Inc. waiver mailed on 9/28/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Cox, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/25 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(lwb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet