North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Richard E Myers, II
Referred: Kimberly A Swank
Case #: 7:23-cv-01333
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
LaCresha A. Johnson
Doj-Civ
contact info
Alanna Horan
Doj-Civ
contact info
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Robert Fred Battersby
Represented By
Frederick Messner
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Zina Bash
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
William Michael Dowling
The Dowling Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/29 3:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Robert Fred Battersby (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/18 3:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Short Form) against United States of America, filed by Robert Battersby. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/27 3:12 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by LaCresha A. Johnson on behalf of United States of America. (Johnson, LaCresha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/19 12:12 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Alanna Horan on behalf of United States of America. (Horan, Alanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Special Appearance Wed 10/18 1:49 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Zina Bash on behalf of Robert Battersby. (Bash, Zina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Tue 10/17 11:40 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit (Zina Bash) filed by Robert Battersby. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PHV Fee Receipt
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/17 11:42 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Zina Bash must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/17/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
notice Notice to Counsel Tue 09/26 9:35 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding:1 Complaint - All counsel, including local counsel, should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Tue 09/26 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. Related [+]
Related: [-] znick, Debra
Monday, September 25, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/25 6:10 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Dowling on behalf of Robert Battersby. (Dowling, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/25 5:14 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick Messner on behalf of Robert Battersby. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 09/25 5:13 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Robert Battersby (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/25 5:12 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7282461.), filed by Robert Battersby. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet