North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Brian S Meyers
Case #: 7:23-cv-01337
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Elizabeth Ann Barry
Doj-Civ
contact info
Daniel Charles Eagles
Doj-Civ
contact info
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Julia Ann Burkhead
Represented By
Frederick Messner
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Zina Bash
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
William Michael Dowling
The Dowling Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/19 7:01 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Short Form) against United States of America, filed by Julia Burkhead. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Special Appearance Wed 10/18 2:04 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Zina Bash on behalf of Julia Burkhead. (Bash, Zina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Tue 10/17 12:03 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit (Zina Bash) filed by Julia Burkhead. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PHV Fee Receipt
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/17 12:42 PM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Zina Bash must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/17/2023. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 4:33 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Ann Barry on behalf of United States of America. (Barry, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/29 4:09 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Charles Eagles on behalf of United States of America. (Eagles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Tue 09/26 12:16 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/25 6:16 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by William Michael Dowling on behalf of Julia Burkhead. (Dowling, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/25 5:41 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick Messner on behalf of Julia Burkhead. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 09/25 5:40 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Julia Burkhead (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/25 5:38 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7282503.), filed by Julia Burkhead. (Messner, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet