Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Mark S Norris
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:23-mc-00034
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Aug 05, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, August 05, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 08/05 12:40 PM
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE MATTER. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 8/5/2024. (Norris, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/01 4:48 PM
NOTICE by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp. re33 Order (Bedell, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
33 33 2 pgs order Order Tue 07/30 10:27 AM
ORDER TO FILE NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on July 30, 2024. (cet)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 07/30 10:25 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting21 Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney Michael E. Bloom. No response or objection to the motion has been filed, and the deadline to do so has passed. For good cause shown, the motion to withdraw is GRANTED. Attorney Michael Elliot Bloom terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on July 30, 2024. (cet)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/31 3:36 PM
NOTICE by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp. re 30 Status Conference,, (Bedell, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
30 30 minutes Status Conference Mon 05/20 1:41 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff: Status Conference held on May 20, 2024. Present were James Bedell and Julie Loftus, counsel for Petitioners, and Aubrey Greer, counsel for Respondent. The status of the discovery sought in the petition was discussed. Petitioners do not currently request relief regarding additional document production and instead seek to schedule Respondents deposition. Respondent is unopposed. By May 31, 2024, the parties shall file a notice indicating the scheduled deposition date and providing an update as to any other outstanding issues related to the petition. (cet)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
29 29 notice Setting Letter - Teams Thu 05/16 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF RESETTING : Scheduling Conference set for Monday, 5/20/2024 AT 10:00 AM in Virtual before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Vallonda Pettway at Vallonda_Pettway@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (vup)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 05/16 3:00 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING27 MOTION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. The Status Conference will now take place at 10:00 a.m. CDT on Monday, May 20, 2024, via Microsoft Teams. (jad)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Continue Thu 05/16 10:58 AM
MOTION to Continue Status Conference Set for May 17, 2024 by Brannon Howse. (Greer, Aubrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
26 26 notice Setting Letter - Teams Wed 05/15 4:41 PM
SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 5/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Virtual before Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Vallonda Pettway at Vallonda_pettway@gmail.com for any questions. (vup)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/15 11:08 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on May 15, 2024. (cet)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
24 24 respoth Affidavit in Support Tue 05/07 11:48 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re23 Memorandum in Support of Motion by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp..(Bedell, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Motion to Withdraw,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Reassignment,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - April 15 Order
23 23 2 pgs misc Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 05/07 11:34 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re22 MOTION Status Conference proposed order submitted filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Bedell, James)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/07 11:28 AM
MOTION Status Conference proposed order submitted by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp..(Bedell, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Consultation
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 05/01 11:59 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Michael E. Bloom, proposed order submitted by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Bedell, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/30 2:09 PM
NOTICE by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp. re1 Petition Re: Subpoena from Another District - Smartmatic's Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Compliance with Third-Party Submpoena(Bloom, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James R. Bedell
Friday, October 27, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order Fri 10/27 11:34 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 10/27/2023. (Norris, Mark)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 10/27 11:13 AM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING17 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF. Smartmatic USA Corp. and Smartmatic International Holding B.V.'s (collectively, "Smartmatic") motion is GRANTED . Smartmatic shall file its reply brief on the docket within 7 days of the date of this Order. . IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 10/27/2023. (Norris, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
17 17 motion Leave to File Document Mon 10/23 5:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to File - Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief (proposed order submitted) by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp..(Bloom, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 7.2(A)(1)(B) Certificate,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Smartmatic's Reply Brief
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/18 1:34 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 101823. (msn)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/18 1:32 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 101823. (msn)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/18 1:31 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 101823. (msn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/17 5:13 PM
NOTICE by Brannon Howse of Response in Opposition to Motion to Enforce Subpoena(Greer, Aubrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - June 12, 2023, Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - June 23, 2023, Letter
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/17 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aubrey Brode Greer on behalf of Brannon Howse (Greer, Aubrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/13 12:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4255973) by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Bedell, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/13 12:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4255972) by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Loftus, Julie)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/13 12:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4255967) by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Bloom, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Thu 10/05 9:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion to Compel Compliance with Third-Party Subpoena, its Memorandum in Support, and all supporting documents served on Brannon Howse on 9-27-23, filed by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp..(Shah, Kalpesh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Service
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
7 7 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Wed 09/27 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice LR 16.2 Wed 09/27 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/27 9:17 AM
Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/25 6:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp.. (Shah, Kalpesh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/25 6:52 PM
NOTICE by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp. re1 Petition Re: Subpoena from Another District - Declaration of Julie M. Loftus(Shah, Kalpesh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Smartmatic's First Supplemental Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Howse Subpoena Packet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Transcript of the video Absolute Proof,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Defendant Michael Lindell's Third Supplemental Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Defendant MyPillow's Second Supplemental Answers to Plaintiffs' Interrogatory No. 6,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Transcript of the video Updates on the Smartmatic Lawsuit and The Cast Vote Records,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Proof of Service of Subpoenas,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Brannon Howse's responses and objections to the subpoenas,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - June 23, 2023 email from Aubrey Greer to Julie Loftus,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - August 29, 2023 email from James Bedell to Aubrey Greer,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - August 14, 2023 email from Julie Loftus to Aubrey Greer,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Subpoena for Deposition Testimony served on Brannon Howse,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - DEF01830102,
Att: 14 Exhibit N - DEF006942,
Att: 15 Exhibit O - DEF018804-05,
Att: 16 Exhibit P - DEF053614,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q - DEF030762-63,
Att: 18 Exhibit R - BH Subpoena Doc. Prod. 000001-04,
Att: 19 Exhibit S - BH Subpoena Doc. Prod. 00127282,
Att: 20 Exhibit T - DEF075379
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/25 6:34 PM
NOTICE by SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V., Smartmatic USA Corp. re1 Petition Re: Subpoena from Another District - Memorandum of Law In Support of Smartmatic's Motion to Compel Compliance with Third-Party Subpoena (Shah, Kalpesh)
Related: [-]
1 1 misccs Petition Re: Subpoena from Another District Mon 09/25 6:17 PM
PETITION RE: SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT (Filing fee $ 49 receipt number ATNWDC-4242983), filed by Smartmatic USA Corp., SGO Corporation Limited, Smartmatic International Holding B.V..(Shah, Kalpesh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet