Alaska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gary Spraker
Case #: 3:23-bk-00163
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Claims Deadline:Dec 04, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Jan 26, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Wards Cove Packing Company, LLC
2510 W Casino Rd Ste B
Everett, WA 98204-1419
Represented By
Thomas A. Buford, III
Bush Kornfeld LLP
contact info
Christine M. Tobin-Presser
Bush Kornfeld LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
700 Stewart Street, Suite 5103
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
Kathryn Evans
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, March 13, 2025
121 121 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims Thu 03/13 8:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Transfer of Claim. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] DE#119 Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim
120 120 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims Thu 03/13 8:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Transfer of Claim. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] DE#118 Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
119 119 claims Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice) Tue 03/11 10:39 AM
Notice of Transfer of Claim. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Doll Mack Wells PLLC (Claim No. 4) To Douglas Morrison PLLC Fee Amount $28. (Morrison, Douglas) Modified on 3/11/2025 - this entry was linked to the wrong claim when docketed. The utility event has been entered to correctly link this transfer to POC #3. (DW)
Related: [-]
utility Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC Tue 03/11 9:27 AM
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC. Related [+].(JL)
Related: [-] DE#118 Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim
utility Transfer of Claim Fee Paid Tue 03/11 10:31 AM
Transfer of claim filing fee has been paid RE: POC# 3. Related [+].(JL)
Related: [-] DE#118 Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim
utility Claim Utility (spreads to claims register - image or no image - can set claim status) Tue 03/11 11:29 AM
Utility event to update Claims Register for POC # 3 DE#119 Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim is being linked to the correct claim. (JL)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 03/11 9:16 AM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-00163 ) [claims,trclmcr] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2223537. Fee amount 28.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#118
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 03/11 10:40 AM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-00163 ) [claims,trclmcr] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2223567. Fee amount 28.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#119
utility Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC Tue 03/11 1:36 PM
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC per DE#119 Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim). (LD)
Related: [-]
utility Transfer of Claim Fee Paid Tue 03/11 1:40 PM
Transfer of claim filing fee has been paid RE: Amended POC# 3 per DE#119 Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim). (LD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
118 118 claims Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice) Mon 03/10 12:51 PM
Notice of Transfer of Claim. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Doll Mack Wells PLLC (Claim No. 3) To Douglas Morrison PLLC Fee Amount $28. (Morrison, Douglas)
Related: [-]