Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:23-cv-00412
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Sep 27, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 23, 2024 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Jason English
Defendant
John Galipeau
Defendant
Westville Correctional Subordanates
Plaintiff
Dominique D Steele
181166 Westville Correctional Facility 5501 South 1100 West
Westville, IN 46391


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, October 30, 2023
4 4 misc Letter Thu 11/02 3:31 PM
**FILED IN ERROR** Letter from Dominique Steele to Judge Collins. (shk) Modified on 11/2/2023 (shk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, October 19, 2023
3 3 misc Mail Returned Thu 10/19 2:49 PM
Mail Returned from Dominique D Steele1 Pro Se Complaint and Docket Sheet. Envelope marked Return to Sender - Refused - Enclosed Item not Allowed. (ash)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
2 2 1 pgs order Order Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/27 2:17 PM
ORDER: The clerk is DIRECTED to close this case and open a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division with the same judges. New case number 3:23-cv-875.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 09/27/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Tue 09/26 10:43 AM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Jason English, John Galipeau, Westville Correctional Subordanates, filed by Dominique D Steele. No IFP or filing fee received. (File stamped copy mailed plaintiff)(ash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Envelope