New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Referred: Jennifer E Willis
Case #: 1:23-cv-08457
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12188 Americans With Disabilities Act - Civil Enforcement Actions
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Oct 19, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Plaintiff
Lashawn Dawson
Represented By
Gabriel Levy
Gabriel A. Levy, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Netbrands Media Corp.
Terminated: 10/19/2023


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, October 19, 2023
8 8 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 10/19 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Plaintiff, LASHAWN DAWSON, by and through undersigned counsel and pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, hereby voluntarily dismiss this actionwithout prejudice against the named Defendant. Any pending motions are moot and any conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED., Netbrands Media Corp. terminated. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/19/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/18 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Netbrands Media Corp.. Document filed by Lashawn Dawson. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 order Order Thu 09/28 3:57 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff alleges that Defendant's website is not accessible to blind and visually impaired customers and, thus, violates Title III of the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. § 12181 et seq. In the Court's experience, cases involving such claims almost always settle, often even before the initial pretrial conference. To that end, by separate Order to be entered today, the Court is referring this case to the assigned Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial Purposes, including settlement. To be clear, the referral does not encompass any dispositive motions, which will be handled by the undersigned in the normal course. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/28/2023) (tg)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/28 3:54 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer E Willis. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/28/2023) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 09/27 3:00 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Netbrands Media Corp...(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 09/27 11:06 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 09/27 11:06 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 09/27 11:06 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 09/27 11:07 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gabriel Levy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lashawn Dawson, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 09/27 11:29 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gabriel Levy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 09/26 10:18 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NETBRANDS MEDIA CORP, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Lashawn Dawson, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 09/26 10:17 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 10:17 AM
COMPLAINT against Netbrands Media Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28338057)Document filed by Lashawn Dawson, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]