Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-52125

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:23-ap-02060
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Apr 05, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Randall E Linsted
8025 Olentangy River Rd.
Columbus, OH 43235
Represented By
Randall E Linsted
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph S. Huang
43 Pruitt Blvd.
Akron, OH 44311
Represented By
Matthew R Duncan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, April 05, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 04/05 3:13 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:23-ap-2060 (dap)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/05 3:15 PM
Adversary Case 2:23-ap-2060 Closed (dap)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 17, 2023
9 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Mon 12/18 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 12/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)8 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, December 14, 2023
8 8 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 12/15 9:19 AM
Agreed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Compromise Compliant of Creditor, Joseph S. Huang to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§523 (A) and 727 Related [+] (dap)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 12/06 4:15 PM
Agreed Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Randall E Linsted (Ditullio, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/25 5:22 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Randall E Linsted. (Ditullio, Mark)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 30, 2023
5 5 BNC Certificate of Mailing - BNC Sun 10/01 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/30/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)3 Order Regarding Deficient Filing
Thursday, September 28, 2023
4 4 misc Substitute PDF Thu 09/28 4:21 PM
Substitute PDF Substitute Summons and Certificate of Service Issued and Served Filed by Plaintiff Joseph S. Huang Related [+]. (Duncan, Matthew)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued and Served,3 Order Regarding Deficient Filing
3 3 order Regarding Deficient Filing Thu 09/28 2:29 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing and Order Setting Deadline for Compliance Regarding: Related [+]. (dap)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued and Served
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
2 2 misc Summons Issued and Served Tue 09/26 2:09 PM
Summons(es) Issued and Served on Randall E Linsted on 9/26/2023, Answer due on 10/26/2023 (Duncan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 11:20 AM
Adversary case 2:23-ap-02060. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))), (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)): Complaint by Joseph S. Huang against Randall E Linsted. Fee Amount $350 Complaint of Creditor, Joseph S. Huang to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C.§§ 523 and 727 (Duncan, Matthew)
Related: [-]