Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Andrew P Rodovich
Referred: Andrew P Rodovich
Case #: 4:23-cv-00081
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Case in other court:White Circuit Court, 91C01-2308-CT-000034
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 6:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Oscar Arroyo
Represented By
Laureen R White
Heplerbroom Llc - Ham/in
contact info
Andrew B Symns
Heplerbroom Llc - Ham/in
contact info
Justin K Curtis
Heplerbroom Llc - Ham/in
contact info
Defendant
Biotrans, LLC
Represented By
Laureen R White
Heplerbroom Llc - Ham/in
contact info
Andrew B Symns
Heplerbroom Llc - Ham/in
contact info
Justin K Curtis
Heplerbroom Llc - Ham/in
contact info
Mediator
Mark Metzger
Plaintiff
Abdulahi Ali
Represented By
Phillip D Olsson
Hensley Legal Group Pc - Fis/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
28 28 order Order on Motion to Withdraw Mon 03/03 4:49 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the27 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Laureen R White ORDERED WITHDRAWN. Attorneys Justin K Curtis and Andrew B Symns remain counsel for referenced defendants. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 03/03/2025. Text entry order. (jdb)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Withdraw Mon 03/03 11:59 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Appearance by Defendants Oscar Arroyo, Biotrans, LLC. (Curtis, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
26 26 adr Report of Mediation Fri 01/24 11:16 AM
REPORT of Mediation by Mark Metzger.(Metzger, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 01/21 11:48 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery24 , finding good cause shown, and EXTENDS the deadlines as follows: Fact Discovery deadline is 3/24/2025. Expert Discovery deadline is 6/24/2025. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 3/24/2025. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 4/23/2025. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 01/21/2025. Text entry order. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 01/17 10:18 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Abdulahi Ali.(Olsson, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 11/19 3:45 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery22 , finding good cause shown, and EXTENDS the following deadlines: Fact Discovery deadline is 1/23/2025. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 1/23/2025. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 2/22/2025. Expert Discovery deadline is 4/25/2025. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/19/2024. Text entry order. (jdb)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 11/19 2:34 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Abdulahi Ali.(Olsson, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/19 3:46 PM
***Deadline terminated per DE 23. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 09/16 3:55 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery20 , finding good cause shown, and EXTENDS the deadlines for Fact Discovery to 11/24/2024; Expert Discovery to 2/24/2025; Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 11/24/2024; Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 12/24/2024. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 09/16/2024. Text entry order. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 09/13 4:29 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Abdulahi Ali.(Olsson, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 23, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Discovery Thu 05/23 11:59 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS18 Motion for Discovery. The deadline for written discovery is EXTENDED to 08/23/2024. The deadline for fact discovery is EXTENDED to 9/24/2024. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 05/23/2024. Text entry order. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
18 18 motion Discovery Wed 05/22 3:57 PM
MOTION for Discovery Extend Certain Case Deadlines by Defendants Oscar Arroyo, Biotrans, LLC. (White, Laureen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/05 4:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Biotrans, LLC. (White, Laureen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/13 4:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Biotrans, LLC. (White, Laureen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Full Consent to Magistrate Judge - Standard Tue 12/12 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to the most recent General Order regarding civil case assignment from Senior Judge James T Moody to Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Failure to Return Consent Form (Standard) Mon 12/11 2:58 PM
NOTICE: Abdulahi Ali, Oscar Arroyo, Biotrans, LLC was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #10 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. Abdulahi Ali, Oscar Arroyo, Biotrans, LLC shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by phone (jdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Fri 11/17 12:03 PM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/17/2023, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Phillip Olsson. Dfts appeared by atty Andrew Symns. Corporate disclosure statement to filed by 12/13/2023. The Report filed as DE12 is APPROVED and ADOPTED through the close of discovery as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 1/26/2024. Written discovery to be issued by 5/23/2024. Fact discovery to be completed by 6/24/2024. Expert discovery to be completed by 11/25/2024. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 9/23/2024. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 10/23/2024. The last date to seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings for Pltf is 3/25/2024; for Dfts is 4/25/2024. Mark Metzger appointed as mediator. Results of the mediation shall be filed with the court no later than 10 days before the final pretrial conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/8/2023. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. (tc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Fri 11/10 3:20 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (White, Laureen)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/30 3:09 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Oscar Arroyo, Biotrans, LLC.(White, Laureen)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
10 10 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Fri 10/27 10:50 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 10/27 10:49 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2023 10:30 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Parties are instructed to dial 833-568-8864, enter Meeting ID 161 6723 3388 and passcode 649671 when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/27/2023. (tc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/03 5:32 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS7 Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. The deadline for Defendants Oscar Arroyo, Biotrans, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED to 11/3/2023. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 10/3/2023. Text entry only. (tc)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 10/03 4:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 State Court Complaint by Defendants Oscar Arroyo, Biotrans, LLC. (White, Laureen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 order Order Thu 09/28 9:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/28/2023. (tc)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Symns on behalf of All Defendants (Symns, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen Renee White on behalf of All Defendants (White, Laureen)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/28 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin K Curtis on behalf of All Defendants (Curtis, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/27 4:41 PM
Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. NEW CASE. (nal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 09/26 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5365152.) from White Circuit Court, Cause No. 91C01-2308-CT-000034, filed by Hensley Legal Group, PC.(White, Laureen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
2 2 cmp State Court Complaint Wed 09/27 4:45 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Oscar Arroyo and Biotrans, LLC filed in White Curcuit Court by Abdulahi Ali. (nal)
Related: [-]