Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:23-cv-01512
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Feb 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 3:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Federal Housing Finance Agency
Represented By
Leslie Bryan Hart
Fennemore Craig, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Sandra L. Thompson
Represented By
Leslie Bryan Hart
Fennemore Craig, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Saticoy Bay LLC Series 256 Camino Viejo
Represented By
Michael F. Bohn
Law Office Of Michael F. Bohn
contact info
Plaintiff
Saticoy Bay LLC Series 3338 Flying Colt
Represented By
Michael F. Bohn
Law Office Of Michael F. Bohn
contact info
Plaintiff
Saticoy Bay LLC Series 452 Crocus Hill
Represented By
Michael F. Bohn
Law Office Of Michael F. Bohn
contact info
Plaintiff
Saticoy Bay LLC Series 6119 Magic Mesa St
Represented By
Michael F. Bohn
Law Office Of Michael F. Bohn
contact info
Plaintiff
Saticoy Bay LLC Series 7413 W Russell Rd
Represented By
Michael F. Bohn
Law Office Of Michael F. Bohn
contact info
Plaintiff
Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9229 Milikan Ave
Represented By
Michael F. Bohn
Law Office Of Michael F. Bohn
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, March 07, 2024
19 19 notice Notice Lis Pendens Thu 03/07 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Saticoy Bay LLC Series 6119 Magic Mesa St. Release of Lis Pendens . (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 02/12 1:17 PM
ORDER Denying17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/9/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
17 17 motion Motion Dismiss Thu 02/08 4:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Federal Housing Finance Agency, Sandra L. Thompson. Responses due by 2/22/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/18/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/24/2024. (Hart, Leslie Bryan)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/08 11:33 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the plaintiffs' claims against the defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
14 14 misc Notice 4m Dismissal Mon 01/08 9:14 AM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint * in this action was filed on * 09/26/2023. * To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to * Federal Housing Finance Agency and Sandra L. Thompson. * FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 2/7/2024. (HAM)
Related: [-]
notice MDC - Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Mon 01/08 3:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01512-APG-MDC . (no image attached) (LG)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
13 13 notice Notice Lis Pendens Fri 12/15 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9229 Milikan Ave. Release of Lis Pendens . (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice Lis Pendens Fri 12/15 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Saticoy Bay LLC Series 452 Crocus Hill. Release of Lis Pendens . (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice Lis Pendens Fri 12/15 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Saticoy Bay LLC Series 256 Camino Viejo. Release of Lis Pendens . (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
10 10 notice Notice Lis Pendens Fri 12/01 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Saticoy Bay LLC Series 3338 Flying Colt. . (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
9 9 notice Notice Lis Pendens Mon 10/09 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Saticoy Bay LLC Series 6119 Magic Mesa St. . (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice Lis Pendens Mon 10/09 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Saticoy Bay LLC Series 452 Crocus Hill. . (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
order Standing Order Thu 09/28 1:19 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 09/27 7:44 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Housing Finance Agency, Sandra L. Thompson. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 09/27 7:41 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
5 5 notice Notice Lis Pendens Tue 09/26 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Defendant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9229 Milikan. . (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice Lis Pendens Tue 09/26 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Defendant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 3338 Flying Colt. . (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice Lis Pendens Tue 09/26 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Defendant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 256 Camino Viejo. . (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 09/26 11:17 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Saticoy Bay LLC Series 256 Camino Viejo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 11:06 AM
COMPLAINT against Federal Housing Finance Agency (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7439107) by Saticoy Bay LLC Series 256 Camino Viejo. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/6/2023. Proof of service due by 12/25/2023. (Bohn, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons