Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-20202

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert L Jones
Case #: 2:23-ap-02004
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Last checked: never
Cross Defendant
GEA Farm Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas C. Scannell
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Stephen Austin Jones
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Rachel Kingrey
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Peter L. Loh
Foley Gardere
contact info
Cross Defendant
GEA North America, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas C. Scannell
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Peter Loh
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Stephen Austin Jones
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Rachel Kingrey
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Cross-Claimant
Paul Miguel
Represented By
Abel Leal
Leal Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Cross-Claimant
Miguel Dairy Service and Supply, Inc
Represented By
Abel Leal
Leal Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
GEA Farm Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas C. Scannell
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Stephen Austin Jones
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Rachel Kingrey
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Peter L. Loh
Foley Gardere
contact info
Defendant
GEA North America, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas C. Scannell
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Stephen Austin Jones
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Rachel Kingrey
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Peter L. Loh
Foley Gardere
contact info
Defendant
Paul Miguel
Represented By
Abel Leal
Leal Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Miguel Dairy Service and Supply, Inc
Represented By
Abel Leal
Leal Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Schouten, Individually and Doing Business as Mission Dairy
3850 County Road 21
Hereford, TX 79045
Represented By
Ethan Michael Lange
Stueve Siegel Hanson
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Saturday, May 17, 2025
139 139 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sat 05/17 11:18 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 05/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 138 First Amended Stipulated Scheduling Order (related document137 ) Trial Docket Call date set for 12/7/2026 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/morris. Entered on 5/15/2025.
Thursday, May 15, 2025
138 138 order Amend scheduling order Thu 05/15 9:45 AM
First Amended Stipulated Scheduling Order Related [+] Trial Docket Call date set for 12/7/2026 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/morris. Entered on 5/15/2025. (Spelmon, Teshauna)
Related: [-] 137