Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-01513
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, A-23-873608-C
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 3:02 AM PDT
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Sean D. Cooney
Carman Cooney Forbush PLLC
contact info
Benjamin J Carman
The Big Guns Injury Attorneys
contact info
Sean Forbush
Carmen Cooney Forbush PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Proctor
Represented By
Michael Shirts
Dimopoulos Law Firm
contact info
Steve Dimopoulos
Dimopoulos Injury Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Fri 02/28 10:43 AM
ORDER Granting21 Stipulation DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Clerk of Court directed to CLOSE CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/27/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
21 21 motion Stipulation Wed 02/26 1:18 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cooney, Sean) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 10/16 10:08 AM
ORDER granting19 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 3/16/2025. Motions due by 4/16/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/15/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Stipulation Tue 10/15 11:42 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) by Plaintiff Jason Proctor. (Shirts, Michael) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 08/08 9:13 AM
ORDER Granting17 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 1/16/2025. Motions due by 2/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/8/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
17 17 motion Stipulation Wed 08/07 4:50 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Plaintiff Jason Proctor. (Shirts, Michael) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
16 16 notice Notice Other Tue 06/18 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Plaintiff Jason Proctor by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Cooney, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Correspondence Unilaterally setting Deposition
Friday, February 16, 2024
15 15 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Tue 02/20 1:24 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (CT)
Related: [-]
14 14 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Tue 02/20 1:23 PM
ORDER granting13 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/18/2024. Motions due by 11/15/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/16/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT) (Main Document 14 replaced on 2/20/2024) (CT)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 02/16 5:02 PM
Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jason Proctor.. (Shirts, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Response Fri 02/16 5:00 PM
RESPONSE to10 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Jason Proctor. (Shirts, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 02/07 12:06 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/17/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/23/2024.(Cooney, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Show Cause Tue 02/06 12:49 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must show cause, in writing, no later than 2/20/2024 why the Court should not recommend this case for dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/5/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
9 9 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Wed 11/01 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re8 Certificate of Interested Parties, by Plaintiff Jason Proctor. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Shirts, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 11/01 1:40 PM
ERROR: Document filed in wrong case. Counsel advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document using the event under the Notices category and link to 8 . CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jason Proctor. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Shirts, Michael) Modified on 11/1/2023 (HAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
7 7 cmp Complaint Amended Thu 10/26 4:51 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jason Proctor by Jason Proctor. No changes to parties. (Shirts, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Status Report Thu 10/26 4:38 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Jason Proctor.. (Shirts, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 10/24 11:10 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jason Proctor. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Shirts, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 10/13 2:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Carman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
misc QC Notice Tue 10/10 8:13 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/17/2023. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
2 2 minord Minute Order Removal Case Tue 09/26 3:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/26/2023. By Deputy Clerk: A.Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/11/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/26/2023) (AMMi)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Tue 09/26 2:28 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from U. S District Court, Case Number A-23-873608-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7439691) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/6/2023. (Carman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 09/26 2:58 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (AMMi)
Related: [-]