Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-01514
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Dec 14, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 3:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Jones Henderson Acquisition, LLC
Represented By
John M Orr
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Gleason
Hatfield & Associates, Ltd. 703 South 8th Street
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Represented By
Trevor J. Hatfield
Hatfield & Associates, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, December 14, 2023
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Thu 12/14 11:36 AM
ORDER Granting14 Stipulation to Dismiss and to Dismiss Complaint Without Prejudice and Refer Plaintiff's Claims to Binding Arbitration. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
14 14 motion Stipulation Wed 12/13 4:27 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND REFER PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION by Defendant Jones Henderson Acquisition, LLC. (Orr, John) (dismiss)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
13 13 respm Response Fri 12/01 4:26 PM
RESPONSE to10 Motion to Compel, by Plaintiff Timothy Gleason. Replies due by 12/8/2023. (Hatfield, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 11/27 11:12 AM
ORDER Granting11 Stipulation for Extension of Time re10 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 12/1/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stipulation Wed 11/22 1:57 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re10 Motion to Compel, by Plaintiff Timothy Gleason. (Hatfield, Trevor) (extend) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
10 10 motion Motion Compel Fri 11/10 3:00 PM
MOTION to Compel Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Stay Discovrey by Defendant Jones Henderson Acquisition, LLC. Responses due by 11/24/2023.(Orr, John) (arbitration)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 11/07 3:12 PM
ORDER granting8 Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Jones Henderson Acquisition, LLC answer due 11/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Stipulation Tue 11/07 11:36 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Jones Henderson Acquisition, LLC. (Orr, John) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/25 4:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Gleason re1 Complaint,,. Jones Henderson Acquisition, LLC served on 10/18/2023. (Hatfield, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 10/10 10:40 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Timothy Gleason. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hatfield, Trevor)
Related: [-]
misc QC Notice Tue 10/10 9:24 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Timothy Gleason. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/17/2023. (no image attached) (EDS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
order Standing Order Wed 09/27 6:50 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/26 4:37 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jones Henderson Acquisition, LLC re1 Complaint. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
2 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (RGDG)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7439586) by Timothy Gleason. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/6/2023. Proof of service due by 12/25/2023. (Hatfield, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 09/26 4:32 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RGDG)
Related: [-]
notice ENE Notice Tue 09/26 4:33 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (RGDG)
Related: [-]