Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Richard G Stearns
Case #: 1:23-cv-12208
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 6:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Committee of the New England Bio Labs, Inc. Employees Stock Ownership Plan
Represented By
Andrew J. Sloniewsky
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Eric Serron
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Joseph M Downes, III
Downes Mcmahon LLP
contact info
Paul J. Ondrasik, Jr.
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Caitlin Rebecca Tharp
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Defendant
James V. Ellard
Represented By
Andrew J. Sloniewsky
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Eric Serron
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Joseph M Downes, III
Downes Mcmahon LLP
contact info
Paul J. Ondrasik, Jr.
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Caitlin Rebecca Tharp
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Richard Ireland
Represented By
Andrew J. Sloniewsky
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Eric Serron
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Joseph M Downes, III
Downes Mcmahon LLP
contact info
Paul J. Ondrasik, Jr.
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Caitlin Rebecca Tharp
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Defendant
New England Biolabs, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew J. Sloniewsky
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Eric Serron
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Joseph M Downes, III
Downes Mcmahon LLP
contact info
Paul J. Ondrasik, Jr.
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Caitlin Rebecca Tharp
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Defendant
New England Biolabs, Inc. Non-Voting Stock Ownership Plan
Represented By
Andrew J. Sloniewsky
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Eric Serron
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Joseph M Downes, III
Downes Mcmahon LLP
contact info
Paul J. Ondrasik, Jr.
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Caitlin Rebecca Tharp
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Personal Representative of Donald Comb
Represented By
Andrew J. Sloniewsky
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Eric Serron
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Joseph M Downes, III
Downes Mcmahon LLP
contact info
Paul J. Ondrasik, Jr.
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Caitlin Rebecca Tharp
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Jackson
Represented By
Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
contact info
Colin M. Downes
Barton & Downes LLP
contact info
R. Joseph Barton
Barton & Downes LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marta Meda
Represented By
Colin M. Downes
Barton & Downes LLP
contact info
R. Joseph Barton
Barton & Downes LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 03 2024
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Dismiss. The court hereby DISMISSES Count III as against the Committee Defendants and Counts IV, V, and VI as against all defendants. (RGS, law4)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
95 95 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 04/23 9:47 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Fairness hearing (Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement) set for 8/6/2025 02:00 PM in Courtroom 21 (In person only) before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (TRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
94 94 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Certify Class Order on Motion for Settlement Mon 04/21 5:17 PM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting87 Motion to Certify Class; granting88 Motion for Settlement. Per the attached order, the court enters the below deadlines. The court will hold a Fairness Hearing on August 6, 2025 at 2 pm. Defendants must provide additional Class Data for Notice by May 21, 2025. Settlement Administrator must provide notice to the Class by May 12, 2025. Settlement Administrator must file Declaration re Class Notice by June 11, 2025. Class Counsel must file Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Expenses and Costs from the Settlement by June 27, 2025. Class Counsel must file a Motion for Class Representatives Service Award by July 3, 2025. Class Members must file any challenges to the Class Data by July 11, 2025. Class Members must file any objections to the Settlement by July 11, 2025. Class Counsel must file a Motion for Final Approval by July 25, 2025. (RGS, law4)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
93 93 notice Notice - Other Fri 04/18 3:32 PM
NOTICE by Marta Meda, Melissa Jackson Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Recommendation for Settlement Administrator(Barton, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Richard Simmons,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Simmons CV and Firm Resume,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Analytics Corporate Overview,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Analytics Bid,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Analytics Bid Including Beneficiaries,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Analytics T&C
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
92 92 order Order Wed 04/16 9:44 AM
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re88 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Marta Meda, Melissa Jackson. Plaintiffs are ordered to provide the name of its recommended settlement administrator no later than 12 pm EST on April 21, 2025 in order for the court to consider this motion. (RGS, law4)
Related: [-]