Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-01515
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1402 Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Mar 07, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 3:03 AM PDT
Defendant
Doctor Sham Loo
3186 S Maryland Pkwy
Las Vegas, NV 89109
Defendant
Doctor Shin
5400 S. Rainbow
Las Vegas, NV 89118
Defendant
Robert J. Futoran, M.D.
7908 W. Sahara Ave
Las Vegas, NV 89015
Defendant
Raja Mehdi, M.D.
6827 W. Tropicana Ave. Ste 110
Las Vegas, NV 89103
Represented By
Casey W Tyler
Hall Prangle & Schoonveld LLC
contact info
Defendant
Amy Rosenbaum, M.D.
1950 Pinto Lane
Las Vegas, NV 89106
Represented By
Robert C McBride
Mcbride Hall
contact info
Olivia Anne Campbell
Hofland & Tomscheck
contact info
Defendant
Spring Valley Hospital and Medical Center
5400 S Rainbow
Las Vegas, NV 89118
Defendant
Sunrise Hospital
3186 S Maryland Pkwy,
Las Vegas, NV 89109
Represented By
Zane Richard Geller
Hall Prangle & Schoonveld, LLC
contact info
Michael E. Prangle
Hall Prangle & Schoonveld
contact info
Defendant
Southern Hills Hospital & Medical Center
Represented By
Zachary J Thompson
Hall Prangle & Schoonveld, LLC
contact info
Ken M Webster
Hall, Prangle, And Schoonveld, LLC
contact info
Michael Tyler McGrady
Hall Prangle & Schoonveld
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick L Perry
645 Bonsai Tree Lane
Henderson, NV 89015


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
34 34 3 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/07 10:07 AM
ORDER adopting32 Report and Recommendations in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint,1 , is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff is advised he may file this action in state court if he so chooses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Objection,33 , is OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motions to Dismiss,6 ,11 ,12 ,14 , and Plaintiffs Motion to Set Aside Defendants Request for Dismissal,22 , are DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/6/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
33 33 misc Objection Report and Recommendation Tue 03/05 3:28 PM
OBJECTION to32 Report and Recommendation by Defendant Raja Mehdi, M.D... Response to Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2024. (Tyler, Casey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
32 32 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 02/21 11:13 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Accordingly, and based on the foregoing, IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Defendants Motions to Dismiss6 ,11 ,12 ,14 be DENIED without prejudice to allow Plaintiff to proceed in state court if he chooses to do so. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs Motion to Set Aside22 be DENIED as moot. Objections to R&R due by 3/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/20/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
31 31 service Proof of Service by Publication Mon 02/05 10:52 AM
Proof of Service by Plaintiff Patrick L Perry. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
30 30 misc Case Management Report Fri 01/19 8:55 AM
Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT Defendants' Joint Case Management Report by Defendant Sunrise Hospital. (Geller, Zane)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
notice MDC - Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Fri 01/12 10:18 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01515-GMN-EJY . (no image attached) (AF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
28 28 misc Notice 4m Dismissal Fri 01/05 9:18 AM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * complaint * in this action was filed on * 9/26/2023. * To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to * Robert J. Futoran, M.D.; Doctor Shin; Doctor Sham Loo; Spring Valley Hospital and Medical Center. * FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 2/4/2024. (WJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/04 10:11 AM
ORDER - Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/19/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
26 26 misc Joinder Wed 12/27 1:20 PM
JOINDER to23 Response by Defendant Sunrise Hospital.(Geller, Zane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
25 25 misc Joinder Wed 12/27 11:16 AM
JOINDER to23 Response by Defendant Southern Hills Hospital & Medical Center.(McGrady, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Friday, December 22, 2023
24 24 misc Joinder Fri 12/22 1:41 PM
JOINDER to23 Response by Defendant Raja Mehdi, M.D.. (Tyler, Casey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
23 23 respm Response Wed 12/20 9:48 AM
RESPONSE to22 Motion by Defendant Amy Rosenbaum, M.D.. Replies due by 12/27/2023.(McBride, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service Emails
Friday, December 15, 2023
22 22 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/18 1:55 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Defendant's Request for Dismissal by Plaintiff Patrick L Perry. Responses due by 12/29/2023. (CAH) (misc) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
21 21 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Thu 11/30 12:20 PM
NON-OPPOSITION to12 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Southern Hills Hospital & Medical Center. (Webster, Ken)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Thu 11/30 9:19 AM
NON-OPPOSITION to11 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Raja Mehdi, M.D.. (Tyler, Casey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
19 19 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Wed 11/29 9:54 AM
NON-OPPOSITION to14 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Sunrise Hospital. (Geller, Zane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
18 18 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Tue 11/14 10:20 AM
NON-OPPOSITION to6 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Amy Rosenbaum, M.D.. (McBride, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 11/09 10:31 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Raja Mehdi, M.D.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Tyler, Casey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
16 16 order Minute Order Klingele Wed 11/08 5:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/8/2023. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to11 12 and14 Motions to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 11/08 4:54 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sunrise Hospital. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Geller, Zane)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Motion Dismiss Wed 11/08 4:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss6 Motion to Dismiss,,1 Complaint, by Defendant Sunrise Hospital. Responses due by 11/22/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/18/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/23/2023. (Geller, Zane)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 11/08 4:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Southern Hills Hospital & Medical Center. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Webster, Ken)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Motion Dismiss Wed 11/08 4:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss6 Motion to Dismiss,,1 Complaint, by Defendant Southern Hills Hospital & Medical Center. Responses due by 11/22/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/18/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/23/2023.(Webster, Ken)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
11 11 motion Motion Dismiss Tue 11/07 3:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint, by Defendant Raja Mehdi, M.D.. Responses due by 11/21/2023. (Tyler, Casey)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Joinder Tue 11/07 2:43 PM
JOINDER to6 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Raja Mehdi, M.D.. (Tyler, Casey)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Fri 10/27 5:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01515-GMN-VCF . (no image attached) (EDS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 10/26 10:39 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Amy Rosenbaum, M.D.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (McBride, Robert)
Related: [-]
minord Minute Order Recusal Thu 10/26 1:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/26/2023. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
6 6 motion Motion Dismiss Wed 10/25 3:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Amy Rosenbaum, M.D.. Responses due by 11/8/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/4/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/9/2023.(McBride, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Civil Docket Page
Thursday, October 19, 2023
misc QC Notice Thu 10/19 6:49 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Patrick L Perry. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/26/2023. (no image attached) (EDS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
misc QC Notice Tue 10/10 9:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Patrick L Perry. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/17/2023. (no image attached) (EDS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
order Standing Order Wed 09/27 7:01 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
2 2 misc Consent for Electronic Service of Documents Tue 09/26 4:36 PM
Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Patrick L Perry. (CT)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Doctor Sham Loo, Doctor Shin, Robert J. Futoran, M.D., Raja Mehdi, M.D., Amy Rosenbaum, M.D., Spring Valley Hospital and Medical Center, Sunrise Hospital (Filing fee $402 - Paid 5845 ) by Patrick L Perry. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/6/2023. Proof of service due by 12/25/2023. (CT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 09/26 2:54 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (CAH)
Related: [-]