Member Case
Lead case is: 6:23-bk-60263

New York Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Patrick G Radel
Case #: 6:23-bk-60723
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023

Debtor
Miles B. Marshall, Inc.
11 Maple Ave
Hamilton, NY 13346-1241
Represented By
Fred Stevens
Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard Etal
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 10 Broad Street, Room 105
Utica, NY 13501


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 6:07 PM EDT
Friday, January 17, 2025
trustee 341Meeting of Creditors Closed. Fri 01/17 11:17 AM
341(a) Meeting of Creditors Closed Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Champion, Erin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
31 31 misc Statement Re: Mon 07/22 4:39 PM
Notice of No Discharge Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. R. 4006. (Murine, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
30 30 court Document Tue 11/28 5:25 PM
An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of M. Burton Marshall a/k/a Burt Marshall a/k/a Miles Burton Marshall and Miles B. Marshall, Inc. The docket in Bankruptcy Case No. 23-60263 PGR should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Related [+]. (Weiler, Sara)
Related: [-] 29
29 29 order Joint Administration Wed 11/08 5:00 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 6:23-bk-60263 with Member Case 6:2023-bk-60723-pgr Related [+] (Davis, Darcy)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
court Hearing Held Tue 11/07 3:09 PM
Hearing Held - Motion GRANTED Related [+]. Order due by 12/07/2023. (Johnson, Colleen)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, November 06, 2023
28 28 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 11/06 3:43 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 09/30/2023 Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notes to Monthly Operating Report
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
27 27 misc Statement Re: Wed 11/01 4:22 PM
Statement Re: Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Order Pursuant to Rule 1015(B) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Revised Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Blackline Version
Friday, October 20, 2023
26 26 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/20 5:01 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc. Related [+]. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 7
25 25 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 10/20 3:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jeffrey A. Dove Filed by on behalf of M. Burton Marshall. (Dove, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 16, 2023
24 24 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 10/16 4:56 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc. Related [+]. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, October 12, 2023
23 23 order Employ Thu 10/12 1:03 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard & Stevens, LLP as General Counsel to the Debtor Effective as of 9/26/23. Related [+] (Davis, Darcy)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
22 22 misc Amended Schedules/Mailing Matrix Wed 10/11 12:29 PM
Amended Non-Individual, Mailing Matrix, Purpose of the Amendment: Additional Notice Parties to Mailing Matrix. Fee Amount $32 Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 10/11 11:08 AM
Receipt of Amended Schedules/Mailing Matrix([LINK 23-60723 6-pgr] ) ( 32.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11684031, amount $ 32.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#19
crditcrd none Wed 10/11 12:30 PM
Receipt of Amended Schedules/Mailing Matrix([LINK 23-60723 6-pgr] ) [misc,amdsched] ( 32.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11684203, amount $ 32.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#22
trustee Consent Wed 10/11 3:01 PM
Consent Related [+] Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Champion, Erin)
Related: [-] 18 Application to Employ Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard & Stevens, LLP as General Counsel to the Debtor Effective as of September 26, 2023 18
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
21 21 misc Equity Security Holders Tue 10/10 10:39 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Tue 10/10 10:38 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Declaration Re: Schedules Tue 10/10 10:37 PM
Declaration Non-Individual , Non-Individual, Schedule AB, Schedule D, Schedule EF, Schedule G, Schedule H, Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information, Declaration,, Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
18 18 7 pgs motion Employ Tue 10/10 4:47 PM
Application to Employ Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard & Stevens, LLP as General Counsel to the Debtor Effective as of September 26, 2023 Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit B - Stevens Declaration
Monday, October 09, 2023
17 17 trustee Bond Mon 10/09 11:09 AM
Amended Bond of Fred Stevens, Chapter 11 Trustee of M. Burton Marshall, Listing Miles B. Marshall, Inc. as Covered Case Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Stevens-Trustee, Fred)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
16 16 misc Declaration Mon 10/02 9:23 PM
Declaration re: Declaration Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 2015-2 Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
trustee 341 Telephonic Call-In Information Mon 10/02 8:31 AM
Section 341 Telephonic Meeting Call-in Information: 877-718-0473 Participant Code: 1422055 Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Champion, Erin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 01, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Mon 10/02 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Friday, September 29, 2023
14 14 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Fri 09/29 11:39 AM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/26/2023 at 02:00 PM at First Meeting Utica. Proofs of Claim due by 12/5/2023. Government Proof of Claim due by 3/24/2024. (Davis, Darcy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/29 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
12 12 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 09/28 3:15 PM
Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Court Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/28 9:58 AM
Court Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. (Original was blank) (Bazan, Judy)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/27 4:34 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc. Related [+]. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 9 ,6
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/27 1:28 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing to Consider Chapter 11 Trustee's Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 11/7/2023 at 11:30 AM at Utica CourtRoom. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 6
8 8 order Directing DIP Duties Wed 09/27 11:15 AM
Order Directing DIP Duties together with court's certificate of mailing . (Bazan, Judy)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Wed 09/27 11:14 AM
Order Setting Last Day To File Proofs of Claim . Proofs of Claim due by 12/5/2023. Governmental unit fixes as 3/24/24. (Bazan, Judy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
6 6 6 pgs motion Joint Administration Tue 09/26 11:04 PM
Motion for Joint Administration with Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case of M. Burton Marshall, Case No. 23-60263 Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 09/26 5:39 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Stevens, Fred)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Update Ch 11 Deficiency Deadlines Tue 09/26 4:46 PM
Notice of Deadlines. Atty Disclosure Statement due 10/10/2023.Corporate Ownership Statement due 9/26/2023. 20 Largest Mailing Matrix due 9/28/2023. Certification of 20 Largest Creditor Matrix due 9/28/2023. Declaration Concerning Schedules due 10/10/2023. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/10/2023. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 9/28/2023.Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 10/10/2023Schedule A/B due 10/10/2023. Schedule D due 10/10/2023.Schedule E/F due 10/10/2023. Schedule G due 10/10/2023. Schedule H due 10/10/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/10/2023.Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 10/10/2023.Affidavit Pursuant to LR 2015 due by 10/2/2023.Official Form 201A due by 9/26/2023. (Davis, Darcy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Mailing Matrix and/or Certification of Mailing Matrix Tue 09/26 3:34 PM
Certification of Mailing Matrix and Mailing Matrix Filed. Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Stevens, Fred)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Resolution Tue 09/26 12:59 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. (Stevens, Fred)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Attorney Use Tue 09/26 12:55 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Miles B. Marshall, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/24/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 01/24/2024. (Stevens, Fred)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 09/26 12:58 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-60723 6] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11671497, amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1