California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 3:23-cv-04935
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Oct 29, 2024
Case in other court:Texas Western, 6:22-cv-00315
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 3:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Lyft, Inc.
Represented By
Jeremy J Taylor
Baker Botts LLP
contact info
Syed Kamil Fareed
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Bethany Salpietra
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Fare Technologies LLC
Represented By
Susan S.Q. Kalra
Ramey LLP
contact info
William P. Ramey, III
Ramey & Schwaller, LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 23 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lyft, Inc.. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
GPO Jul 31 2023
ORDER GRANTING 25 Sealed Motion to Transfer Venue. All deadlines in this case are VACATED. The case will be transferred 15 days from the date of this order if no objections to this order are filed with the district judge or an order from the district judge resolving any objections to this order under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, whichever is earlier. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
GPO Oct 29 2024
ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE UNDER RULE 41(B). Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 10/29/2024. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2024)

Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
102 102 oth_evt Judgment - Clerk Tue 10/29 3:54 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
101 101 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/29 3:53 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE UNDER RULE 41(B). Signed by Judge Rita F. Lin on 10/29/2024. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
100 100 misc Status Report Mon 10/28 4:28 PM
STATUS REPORT by Fare Technologies LLC. (Kalra, Susan)
Related: [-]