Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:23-cv-01520
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 24, 2024 3:03 AM PDT
Defendant
Oumid Lina Akbar
Represented By
Michael P Lowry
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Kimberly Ann Nelson
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
The TJX Companies, Inc.
Represented By
Michael P Lowry
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Kimberly Ann Nelson
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
Teresa De Jesus Santoyo Rodriguez
Represented By
Alex De Castroverde
De Castroverde Law Group
contact info
Michelle Harnik
contact info
Michelle Judi Harnik
De Castroverde Law Group
contact info
Orlando De Castroverde
De Castroverde Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
54 54 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/07 11:09 AM
ORDER granting53 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/7/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
53 53 motion Stipulation Thu 01/02 10:44 AM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS with Prejudice by Defendants Oumid Lina Akbar, The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Adams, Nicholas) (dismiss)
Related: [-]