Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:23-cv-00411
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Nov 28, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
10 10 misc Mail Returned Thu 12/28 8:27 AM
Mail Returned from Sara Slusher as Undeliverable -8 Order Dismissing Case,9 Clerks Judgment. Envelope marked - Return to Sender, This person is not currently an inmate at the Allen County Jail. (sej)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
9 9 misc Clerks Judgment Tue 11/28 2:28 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (sej)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/28 2:26 PM
ORDER: This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant toFederal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 11/28/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sej)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
7 7 misc Mail Returned Fri 10/20 4:26 PM
Mail Returned from Sara Slusher as Undeliverable - This person is not currently an inmate at the Allen County Jail - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward -5 Order to Show Cause. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
6 6 misc Mail Returned Tue 10/17 8:01 PM
Mail Returned from Sara Slusher as Undeliverable (Not at Allen County Jail) -3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (shk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 10/04 3:31 PM
ORDER: Sara Slusher is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by 10/25/2023, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). She is CAUTIONED if she does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/4/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
4 4 misc Mail Returned Mon 10/02 1:07 PM
Mail Returned from Sara Slusher as Undeliverable -1 Pro Se Complaint. Envelope marked - Return to Sender, No Longer Here. (sej)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/28 12:56 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff, Sara Slusher, IDOC # 283280, Allen County Jail # 618003, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 9/28/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Allen County Jail as directed in Order). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/26 3:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Sara Slusher.(mrm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Tue 09/26 3:06 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Sherrif of Allen County, Allen County Jail, filed by Sara Slusher. Related [+](mrm)
Related: [-] turned file stamped copy with case number to Slusher
Att: 1 Envelope