Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Andrew P Rodovich
Case #: 1:23-cv-00417
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:May 24, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, September 20, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 09/20 5:38 PM
ORDER: the court GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion for Award of Attorney Fees28 and AWARDS Plaintiff $2,057.62 for attorney fees and expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/20/2024. (rs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
29 29 respm Response to Motion Thu 09/05 1:50 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re28 First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. section 2412(d) filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Hinsley, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
28 28 motion Attorney Fees Mon 08/26 5:54 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. section 2412(d) by Plaintiff Dolores R. Alexander.(Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Attorney Statement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Time Log,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-PPI,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- CPI,
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Controller Affidavit,
Att: 6 Exhibit F- Attorney Bio,
Att: 7 Exhibit G- EAJA Assignment
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
27 27 misc Clerks Judgment Tue 05/28 12:49 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order Remanding Case to US Agency Tue 05/28 12:42 PM
ORDER: The court, being duly advised, GRANTS the motion25 pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Commissioner's decision is REMANDED for further administrative proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/24/24. (nhc)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Remand Fri 05/24 9:52 AM
MOTION to Remand by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Hinsley, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jay C Hinsley on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Hinsley, Jay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/01 12:30 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for Defendant to file the Social Security Response Brief of the Government is EXTENDED to 6/7/2024. Further requests to extend this deadline may be viewed with disfavor. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 6/21/2024. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 05/01/2024. Text entry order. (jdb)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/01 10:34 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Hwang, Taehee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/02 3:31 PM
ORDER: The court GRANTS20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for the Defendant to file the Social Security Response Brief of the Government is EXTENDED to 5/10/2024. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 5/24/2024. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 04/02/2024. Text entry order. (jdb)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/02 3:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (unopposed) by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Hwang, Taehee)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
19 19 ss Social Security Opening Brief of Plaintiff Fri 03/01 6:25 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY OPENING BRIEF OF PLAINTIFF by Dolores R. Alexander. (Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/28 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio Lee - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Lee - AUSA, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 02/02 12:10 PM
ORDER: The court GRANTS16 Second Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff to file the Social Security Opening Brief is EXTENDED to 3/1/2024. Further requests to extend this deadline will be viewed with disfavor. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 4/12/2024. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 4/26/2024. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 2/2/2024. Text entry only. (tc)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/02 9:36 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Social Security Brief (Unopposed) by Plaintiff Dolores R. Alexander. (Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 01/05 10:10 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS14 First Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiff to file the Social Security Opening Brief is EXTENDED to 2/2/2024. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 3/15/2024. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 3/29/2024. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 1/5/2024. Text entry only. (tc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 01/04 11:04 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Social Security Brief by Plaintiff Dolores R. Alexander. (Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Full Consent to Magistrate Judge - Standard Wed 12/13 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF FULL CONSENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is fully consented to Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. (sej)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Failure to Return Consent Form (SSA) Wed 12/13 8:43 AM
NOTICE: Counsel for plaintiff was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #11 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. As required by General Order 2020-27, shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by email correspondence. (sej)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
11 11 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent (SSA - MJ Presider) - form will be generated Mon 11/27 2:57 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/11/2023. (tc)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Setting Social Security Deadlines Mon 11/27 2:57 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3, the claimant/plaintiff is directed to file his/her opening brief by the deadline set out below. Failure to do so could result in dismissal of this case pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Briefs under this rule are subject to the page limitations in Local Rule 7-1(e). The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 1/5/2024. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 2/16/2024. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 3/1/2024. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 11/27/2023. Text entry only. (tc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
9 9 ss Social Security Administrative Record Fri 11/24 11:47 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security. (Hwang, Taehee)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/24 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taehee Hwang on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Hwang, Taehee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Commencement of SSA Action Wed 09/27 1:59 PM
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal action (1 Complaint) sent to the Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security Answer or Motion due 11/27/2023. Pursuant to General Order #2022-20, the briefing schedule is as follows: The plaintiff's opening brief must be filed within 42 days after the answer is filed or 42 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under Rule 4(c) of the Supplemental Rules, whichever is later. The Commissioner's response brief must be filed 42 days after service of the opening brief. Any reply brief must be filed 14 days after service of the response brief. (nhc)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/27 1:58 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES payment of the filing fee; and DIRECTS the Clerk to docket a Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal Action. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 9/27/23. (nhc)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/27 8:43 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. **NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING** (rmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/26 6:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas T Lavella on behalf of Dolores R. Alexander (Lavella, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/26 6:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F Richter on behalf of Dolores R. Alexander (Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/26 6:04 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dolores R. Alexander. (Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/26 6:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Dolores R. Alexander.(Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 5:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Dolores R. Alexander.(Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet