Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00873
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:May 24, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
20 20 misc Letter Fri 10/18 2:32 PM
Letter from James Ellis Jr. requesting extension of time to pay filing fee. (nae)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
19 19 misc Docket Annotation - public event with NEF Mon 07/08 8:26 AM
Re-mailed DE9 ,11 ,13 and14 to plaintiff at WCF address. Financial ledger and IFP order sent to WCF as directed in order. (nae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 07/03 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by James Ellis, Jr from Reception Diagnostic Center to Westville Correctional Facility per17 Returned Mail (jld)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Mail Returned Wed 07/03 2:38 PM
Mail Returned from James Ellis, Jr as Undeliverable -9 Order Staying Case,,. Envelope marked RTS, WCC. Copy of document previously forwarded to plaintiff. (jld)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 06/18 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by James Ellis, Jr from Parnall Correctional Facility to Reception Diagnostic Center. (Sent copy of DE9 ,11 ,13 , &14 to Ellis)(Sent IFP Order and financial ledgers to RCD as directed in Order) (kmt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
15 15 misc Mail Returned Tue 06/04 10:42 AM
Mail Returned from James Ellis, Jr. as Undeliverable -13 Order,14 Clerks Judgment. Envelope Marked: Return to Sender - Prisoner has Paroled/Discharged. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
14 14 misc Clerks Judgment Fri 05/24 4:37 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ash)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/24 4:33 PM
ORDER: This case is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of CivilProcedure 41(b). Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/24/2025. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
12 12 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/14 9:13 AM
Mail Returned from James Ellis, Jr as Undeliverable -11 Order to Show Cause. Envelope Marked: Return to Sender - Prisoner has Paroled/Discharged. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 05/01 2:33 PM
ORDER: James Ellis, Jr., is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by 5/21/2024, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/1/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
10 10 misc Mail Returned Mon 04/29 3:32 PM
Mail Returned from James Ellis, Jr. as Undeliverable -9 Order Staying Case, Envelope Marked: Return to Sender - Prisoner has Paroled/Discharged. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Staying Case Tue 04/16 12:07 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE. Before Pla James Ellis Jr may proceed with this case, he must pay the $37.20 arrearage and any future installment payments which have accrued. This case will be stayed until he pays. After he pays, he must file a motion asking to lift the stay with a copy of his ledger demonstrating he has paid as required. If he is unable to pay the entire arrearage by 10/15/2024, he may file a motion asking to lift the stay with a copy of his ledger demonstrating he paid as much as he was able even though he was unable to pay as required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/15/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lns)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
8 8 respm Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 04/01 2:36 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by James Ellis, Jr(nae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Inmate Trust Fund Account Ledger
Monday, March 18, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/18 2:52 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: James Ellis, Jr., is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE by 4/4/2024, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/18/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(shk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 01/17 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by James Ellis, Jr from St. Joseph County Jail to Parnall Correctional Facility and request for status update. (Sent docket sheet and copy of DE4 to Ellis)(Sent financial ledger and IFP Order to Parnall Correctional Facility as directed in Order) (kmt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
5 5 misc Mail Returned Tue 01/02 2:11 PM
Mail Returned from James Ellis, Jr as Undeliverable -4 Order, Envelope marked: Not in Custody - Return to Sender. Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward. Released 10/13/23. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 12/18 11:39 AM
ORDER: James Ellis, Jr., is ORDERED to either pay the entire remaining balance of the filing fee ($350.00) or provide a written explanation showing cause why he has not paid the initial partial filing fee and any required installment payments WITH a copy of his inmate ledger showing every transaction since 10/2/2023. He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by 1/12/2024, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/15/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 10/02 10:14 AM
ORDER: GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF2 ); ORDERS the plaintiff, James Ellis, Jr., IDOC # 872919, Elkhart County Jail #23945, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $15.20 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/2/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party and St. Joseph County Jail)(ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/26 11:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff James Ellis, Jr. (kmt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Tue 09/26 11:44 AM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Vicki E Becker, Elkhart County, Ind, Joshua D Leong, Jeff A Siegel, filed by James Ellis, Jr.(File stamped copy with case number sent to Ellis)(kmt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Envelope